Global Patent Index - EP 1039495 A2

EP 1039495 A2 2000-09-27 - Method for limiting current in low voltage networks, its associated arrangement and special use of this arrangement

Title (en)

Method for limiting current in low voltage networks, its associated arrangement and special use of this arrangement

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Strombegrenzung in Niederspannungsnetzen, zugehörige Anordnung sowie spezielle Verwendung dieser Anordnung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour limitation de courant dans les réseaux basse tension, assemblage y associé et utilisation spéciale de cet assemblage

Publication

EP 1039495 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00105562 A

Priority

DE 19913236 A

Abstract (en)

A current-limitation procedure in which during operation with occurrence of load currents, the diffuse arcing modes of an arc occur and in the event of a short-circuit the arc is split into sequential partial arcs. Vacuum interrupters are used, and more specifically, at least one vacuum interrupter with at least one radial field contact is used, and in which the switch contacts generate a magnetic field extending perpendicularly relative to the direction of current in the arc, and a circulating arc is produced.

Abstract (de)

Aus der Luftschalttechnik sind Methoden zur Strombegrenzung in Niederspannungsnetzen bekannt, wobei im Betriebsfall bei den dabei auftretenden Betriebsströmen diffuse Bogenmoden eines Lichtbogens auftreten und wobei im Kurzschlußfall der Lichtbogen in hintereinanderliegende Teillichtbögen aufgespalten wird. Gemäß der Erfindung werden zur Strombegrenzung Vakuumschaltröhren verwendet. Bei der zugehörigen Anordnung ist wenigstens eine Vakuumschaltröhre (VS) mit zwei Schaltstücken (3, 4; 13, 14; 23, 24)vorhanden, zwischen denen kreisringförmige Lichtbogenteilerplatten (6a -6j; 16a - 16h; 26a - 26h) angeordnet sind. Bei geeigneter Auslegung können solche Anordnungen zum betriebsmäßigen Schalten hoher Ströme verwendet werden. Gegebenenfalls werden solche Anordnungen lediglich zur Überwachung der Ströme, d.h. einmaligen Strombegrenzung, verwendet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/66 (2006.01); H01H 33/664 (2006.01); H01H 33/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/664 (2013.01); H01H 33/66 (2013.01); H01H 33/10 (2013.01); H01H 33/6646 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039495 A2 20000927; EP 1039495 A3 20010808; EP 1039495 B1 20060524; DE 19913236 A1 20001012; DE 19913236 C2 20010222; DE 50012798 D1 20060629

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50012798

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110520

- Year of fee payment: 12

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110321

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090316

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090316

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090316

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070227

2007-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012798 P 20060629

2006-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2006-05-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2002-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020121

2001-08-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-08-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01H 33/66 A, 7H 01H 9/34 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI