Global patent index - EP 1039500 A1

EP 1039500 A1 2000-09-27 - Circuit breaker with movable fuseholder

Title (en)

Circuit breaker with movable fuseholder

Title (de)

Ausschaltanordnung mit bewegbarem Sicherungshalter

Title (fr)

Coupe circuit à porte-fusible monté mobile

Publication

EP 1039500 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400736 A

Priority

FR 9903424 A

Abstract (en)

The drawer moves along arc-shaped guides in order to insert the fuse into the fixed contacts without need for a large insertion force. The circuit breaker comprises a box (11) within which there are two contact elements (12) which stand at a distance from each other. A fuse carrier (14) is provided with an opening (15) which is able to receive a cartridge fuse (16). The fuse carrier is mounted to move between inserted and withdrawn positions so that the fuse is accessible from outside the box. The opening (15) for the fuse carrier is defined by two walls (33,34) which extend transversely w.r.t. the trajectory of the fuse carrier. The movement of the fuse carrier is oblique w.r.t. the alignment of the fixed contacts in the box.

Abstract (fr)

Ce coupe-circuit est du genre comportant, dans un boîtier (11), d'une part, deux organes de contact (12), qui sont établis à distance l'un de l'autre, et, d'autre part, un porte-fusible (14), qui présente un évidement (15) propre au logement d'une cartouche fusible (16), et qui, accessible de l'extérieur du boîtier (11), est monté mobile entre une position de fermeture et une position d'ouverture, l'évidement (15) de ce porte-fusible (14) étant notamment défini par deux parois (33, 34) qui s'étendent globalement transversalement par rapport à son trajet (T). Suivant l'invention, pour la position de fermeture du porte-fusible (14), la paroi (33) arrière de l'évidement (15) s'étend globalement en oblique par rapport à l'alignement (A) des organes de contact (12), en s'écartant de l'un de ceux-ci vers l'arrière au fur et à mesure qu'elle se rapproche de l'autre. Application aux coupe-circuit à porte-fusible cintré ou droit, quel que soit le trajet de ce porte-fusible. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 85/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/545 (2013.01); H01H 85/547 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039500 A1 20000927; FR 2791175 A1 20000922; FR 2791175 B1 20010601

INPADOC legal status

2007-08-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20070223

2003-06-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES GB IT PT

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010305

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GB IT PT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI