Global patent index - EP 1039504 A1

EP 1039504 A1 2000-09-27 - Metal halide discharge lamp

Title (en)

Metal halide discharge lamp

Title (de)

Metallhalogenid-Entladungslampe

Title (fr)

Lampe à décharge aux halogénures métalliques

Publication

EP 1039504 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103679 A

Priority

DE 29905662 U

Abstract (en)

A metal halide discharge lamp, having a rare earth-free filling containing hafnium, zirconium and/or tantalum as lithium substitute, is new. A metal halide discharge lamp, having a rare earth-free filling comprising an ignition gas, mercury, a halogen, indium, thallium and tin, additionally contains hafnium, zirconium and/or tantalum as lithium substitute and has a discharge vessel wall loading of 50 W/cm<2>. Preferred Features: The filling contains 0.20-4.0 mu mol/ml lithium substitute, 0.2-2.0 mu mol/ml indium, 0.05-0.5 mu mol/ml thallium and 0.5-5.0 mu mol/ml tin.

Abstract (de)

Eine Metallhalogenid-Entladungslampe mit Lebensdauer über 1500 Stunden und mit einer Farbtemperatur über 5000 K wird mittels einer seltenerdelementfreien Füllung, die In, TI und Sn sowie Hf, Zr und /oder Ta enthält, erreicht. Die Wandbelastung des Entladungsgefäßes beträgt mindestens 50W/cm<2>. Die erfindungsgemäße Lampe eignet sich vor allem für den Effektlichtbereich.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 61/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29905662 U1 20000810; CA 2301471 A1 20000926; EP 1039504 A1 20000927; JP 3072031 U 20000929; US 6380675 B1 20020430

INPADOC legal status

2012-10-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20120509

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020828

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001106

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI