Global Patent Index - EP 1039507 A3

EP 1039507 A3 2001-04-11 - Production line for semiconductor devices

Title (en)

Production line for semiconductor devices

Title (de)

Fertigungsstrasse für Halbleiterbauelemente

Title (fr)

ChaIne de production pour dispositifs de semi-conducteurs

Publication

EP 1039507 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00302411 A

Priority

JP 8265399 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1039507A2] Provision of a semiconductor-device production line capable of efficiently using a conveying route, effectively operating treatment systems and improving the production efficiency. In the semiconductor-device production line having a section in which a plurality of treatment systems (M) are arrayed in line and a conveying route (1) provided along the treatment systems, buffer ports (P) are respectively provided at positions corresponding to the predetermined treatment systems of all the treatment systems (M) and near the conveying route (1), so that carriages (2) loaded with the wafer substrates and traveling on the conveying route are temporarily moved to the buffer port. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/00; B65G 49/07; H01L 21/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/00 (2006.01); H01L 21/677 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 21/67173 (2013.01); H01L 21/67736 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039507 A2 20000927; EP 1039507 A3 20010411; JP 2000277584 A 20001006; TW 444249 B 20010701

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-23 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030602

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT NL

2001-11-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01L 21/00 A, 7H 01L 21/70 B, 7B 65G 49/07 B

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI