Global Patent Index - EP 1039534 A3

EP 1039534 A3 2001-04-04 - Dynamic random access memory

Title (en)

Dynamic random access memory

Title (de)

Dynamischer Speicher mit wahlfreiem Zugriff

Title (fr)

Mémoire dynamique à accès aléatoire

Publication

EP 1039534 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00103845 A

Priority

US 27533799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1039534A2] A method includes forming a trench capacitor in a semiconductor body. A recess is formed in the upper portion of the capacitor with such recess having sidewalls in the semiconductor body. A first material is deposited over the sidewalls and over a bottom of the recess. A second material is deposited over the first material. A mask is provided over the second material. The mask has: a masking region to cover one portion of said recess bottom; and a window over a portion of said recess sidewall and another portion of said recess bottom to expose underlying portions of the second material. Portions of the exposed underlying portions of the second material are selectively removing while leaving substantially un-etched exposed underlying portions of the first material. The exposed portions of the first material and underlying portions of the semiconductor body are selectively removed. An isolation region is formed in the removed portions of the semiconductor body. The mask is provided over the second material with a masking region covering one portion of said recess sidewall and one portion of said recess bottom and with a window disposed over an opposite portion of said recess sidewall and an opposite portion of said recess bottom to expose underlying portions of the second material. Etching is provided into the exposed underlying portions of the semiconductor body to form a shallow trench in the semiconductor body. An insulating material is formed in the shallow trench to form a shallow trench isolation region. With such method, greater mask misalignment tolerances are permissible. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/8242; H01L 27/108

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 27/108 (2006.01); H01L 21/8242 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 27/10864 (2013.01); H01L 27/10861 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 5198383 A 19930330 - TENG CLARENCE W-H [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0884785 A2 19981216 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
  • [A] US 5670805 A 19970923 - HAMMERL ERWIN [US], et al
  • [Y] "PROCESS SCHEME TO MAKE SHALLOW TRENCH ISOLATION SELF-ALIGNED TO THESTORAGE TRENCH", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, vol. 33, no. 10A, 1 March 1991 (1991-03-01), pages 260 - 262, XP000110034, ISSN: 0018-8689
  • [A] "DIFFUSION (BURIED) STRAP SELF-ALIGNED TO THE STORAGE TRENCH FOR HIGH DENSITY DRAM TRENCH CELLS USING A SPACER TECHNIQUE", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, vol. 37, no. 6A, 1 June 1994 (1994-06-01), pages 159 - 162, XP000455727, ISSN: 0018-8689
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 05 30 April 1998 (1998-04-30) & US 5905279 A 19990518 - NITAYAMA AKIHIRO [JP], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039534 A2 20000927; EP 1039534 A3 20010404; CN 1206721 C 20050615; CN 1272688 A 20001108; JP 2000323684 A 20001124; KR 100413277 B1 20031231; TW 477062 B 20020221; US 6204140 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090901

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061201

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IE IT NL

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010706

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT NL

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI