Global Patent Index - EP 1039572 A2

EP 1039572 A2 2000-09-27 - Device for the pressure tight separation of a first and a second waveguides and process for its manufacture

Title (en)

Device for the pressure tight separation of a first and a second waveguides and process for its manufacture

Title (de)

Baugruppe zur druckdichten Trennung eines ersten Hohlleiters von einem zweiten Hohlleiter sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung einer solchen Baugruppe

Title (fr)

Appareil pour la séparation étanche à la pression d'un premier et un deuxième guide d'ondes et procédé pour sa fabrication

Publication

EP 1039572 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00103744 A

Priority

DE 19911744 A

Abstract (en)

The unit has a pressure tight conducting body (22), a first adapter (26) arranged between the first waveguide (12) and the end of the conducting body facing it and a second adapter (30) between the second waveguide (16) and the end of the conducting body facing it. The dielectric constants of the adapters lie between those of the conducting body and the waveguides. An Independent claim is also included for a method of manufacturing a unit for pressure-tight separation of two waveguides.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Baugruppe zur druckdichten Trennung eines ersten Hohlleiters (12) von einem zweiten Hohlleiter (16), mit einem druckfesten Leiterkörper (22) sowie einem ersten Adapter (26), der zwischen dem ersten Hohlleiter (12) und dem diesem zugewandten Ende des Leiterkörpers (22) angeordnet ist, und einem zweiten Adapter (30), der zwischen dem zweiten Hohlleiter (16) und dem diesem zugewandten Ende des Leiterkörpers (22) angeordnet ist, wobei die Dielektrizitätskonstanten des ersten und des zweiten Adapters (26, 30) zwischen denjenigen des Leiterkörpers (22) und der Hohlleiter (12, 16) liegen. Eine solche Baugruppe kann insbesondere bei einem elektronischen Gerät mit einem Kontaktstift (10) und einer Antenne (18) verwendet werden, wobei der Kontaktstift (10) in einen ersten Hohlleiter (12) einstrahlt und die Antenne (18) mit einem zweiten Hohlleiter (16) verbunden ist und zwischen dem ersten und den zweiten Hohlleiter (12, 16) eine druckdichte Durchführung für Mikrowellenstrahlung benötigt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01P 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/04 (2006.01); H01P 1/08 (2006.01); H01P 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01P 1/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039572 A2 20000927; EP 1039572 A3 20010718; CA 2299851 A1 20000916; CA 2299851 C 20030715; DE 19911744 A1 20001005; DE 19911744 C2 20030227; JP 2000299602 A 20001024; US 6469599 B1 20021022

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-02 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080208

2004-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040705

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ENDRESS + HAUSER GMBH + CO.KG.

2002-04-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI