Global Patent Index - EP 1039587 A1

EP 1039587 A1 2000-09-27 - Connector part meant for mounting on an electrical cable having a helically corrugated outer conductor and mounting method thereof

Title (en)

Connector part meant for mounting on an electrical cable having a helically corrugated outer conductor and mounting method thereof

Title (de)

Steckerteil bestimmt für Montage auf einem elektrischen Kabel mit einem schraubenförmig gewellten Aussenleiter und Verfahren zur Montage

Title (fr)

Elément de connecteur destiné à être monté sur un câble électrique à conducteur externe spiralé et son procédé de montage

Publication

EP 1039587 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400799 A

Priority

FR 9903741 A

Abstract (en)

The connector includes a ring two opposed screw threaded sections ensuring grip on both connector and cable end. The connector element is intended to be mounted on an electrical cable (1) which includes an internal conductor (5) and an external spiral conductor (2). The element comprises a body and a ring (8) which is fastened to the body by being threaded on the outside. The body includes an internally threaded section (14) which is able to receive the spiral section (2) of the cable. It also includes a threaded section (16) enabling the outer ring to be solidly attached to the body. The two threaded sections have threads formed in opposite directions, ensuring the immobilisation of the device when fitted to the body of the connector and cable end.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un élément de connecteur destiné à être monté sur un câble électrique (1) comportant au moins un conducteur interne (5) et un conducteur externe spiralé (2), ledit élément comprenant un corps et une bague (8) apte à être solidarisée au corps par vissage et ayant un tronçon taraudé (14) pour le vissage de la bague sur le conducteur externe spiralé (2) du câble et un tronçon taraudé (16) pour la solidarisation pour vissage de la bague au corps. Les tronçons taraudés (14, 16) de la bague (8) présentent des pas de vis inversés l'un par rapport à l'autre, de sorte que le vissage du corps dans la bague (8), la bague (8) étant immobilisée en rotation, entraîne un rapprochement du corps et du câble (1) l'un vers l'autre. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/646

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/646 (2011.01); H01R 9/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/564 (2013.01); H01R 9/0521 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039587 A1 20000927; CN 1164014 C 20040825; CN 1268791 A 20001004; DE 1039587 T1 20010607; FR 2791476 A1 20000929; FR 2791476 B1 20010518; US 6293824 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061129

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-07 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010210

2001-03-28 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI