Global Patent Index - EP 1039708 A1

EP 1039708 A1 2000-09-27 - CIRCUIT FOR CAPTURING FRAME SYNC SIGNAL IN RECEIVER

Title (en)

CIRCUIT FOR CAPTURING FRAME SYNC SIGNAL IN RECEIVER

Title (de)

SCHALTUNG ZUM FANGEN EINES RAHMENSYNCHRONISIERSIGNALS IN EINEM EMPFÄNGER

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT D'ACQUISITION DE SIGNAL DE SYNCHRONISATION DE TRAME DANS UN RECEPTEUR

Publication

EP 1039708 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98959178 A

Priority

  • JP 9805615 W
  • JP 36819097 A

Abstract (en)

I and Q symbol streams are demodulated from a received signal of a wave to be PSK-modulated in which BPSK-modulated frame-synchronizing signal and superframe-identifying signal respectively having a 20-symbol length and an 8PSK-modulated digital signal are time-multiplexed by a demodulating circuit (1). BPSK-demapped bit streams B0 to B3 are generated by a BSPK demapper (3) in accordance with criterion border lines obtained by rotating a basic BPSK criterion border line and a basic criterion border line whose received-signal points are the same as Q-axis on I-Q phase plane by pi /4, 2 pi /4, and 3 pi /4 counterclockwise. When a pattern having a difference of several bits at most from a frame-synchronizing signal is captured from B0 to B3 by first comparing circuits 60 to 63 and thereafter, a pattern having a difference of several bits at most from a superframe-identifying signal is captured by second comparing circuits 64 to 67 after a predetermined certain time, a frame-synchronizing-signal-capturing-signal generating circuit (90) outputs a frame-synchronizing-signal capturing signal (SYN). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 27/22; H04J 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04J 3/06 (2006.01); H04L 27/22 (2006.01); H04L 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 27/22 (2013.01); H04L 7/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039708 A1 20000927; EP 1039708 A4 20050511; EP 1039708 B1 20071121; CA 2316177 A1 19990708; CA 2316177 C 20080129; CN 1124009 C 20031008; CN 1283355 A 20010207; DE 1039708 T1 20010315; DE 69838759 D1 20080103; DE 69838759 T2 20081030; US 6625239 B1 20030923; WO 9934568 A1 19990708

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141211

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141211

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141211

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69838759

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131209

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131204

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: JVC KENWOOD CORPORATION, JP

- Effective date: 20120705

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JVC KENWOOD CORPORATION, YOKOHAMA-SHI, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD, TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 69838759

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-06-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: JVC KENWOOD CORPORATION, JP

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD, TOKIO/TOKYO, JP

- Document: DE 69838759

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-06-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69838759

- Representative's name: LEINWEBER & ZIMMERMANN, DE

- Effective date: 20120430

2012-04-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69838759

- Representative's name: LEINWEBER & ZIMMERMANN, DE

2008-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080822

2008-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-01-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69838759 P 20080103

2007-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-11-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KABUSHIKI KAISHA KENWOOD

2007-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050825

2005-05-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04L 27/22 A

2005-05-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 04J 3/06 B

2001-03-15 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2000-12-22 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000619

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT