Global patent index - EP 1039778 A1

EP 1039778 A1 2000-09-27 - Device for improving the sound reproduction in the range of low frequencies

Title (en)

Device for improving the sound reproduction in the range of low frequencies

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Verbesserung der Wiedergabe von Schallereignissen im Tieftonbereich

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour l'amélioration de la reproduction sonore dans la gamme des basses fréquences

Publication

EP 1039778 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00103869 A

Priority

  • EP 00103869 A
  • EP 99103840 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a crossover network contg. a low pass filter and a high pass filter. The low pass filter transfer function is a discontinuous rational function with a second order denominator polynomial with a pole Q of 1 and a numerator polynomial consisting of a constant. The high pass filter transfer function is a discontinuous rational function with a second order denominator polynomial with a pole Q of between 0.8 ands 1.2 and a numerator polynomial consisting of a complex quadratic term. The pole frequencies of the filter transfer function denominator polynomials are identical.

Abstract (de)

Bei der Vorrichtung zur Verbesserung bei der Wiedergabe von Schallereignissen mittels einer Frequenzweiche, die ein Tiefpassfilter und ein Hochpassfilter aufweist, ist vorgesehen, dass die Übertragungsfunktion des Frequenzweichentiefpassfilters eine gebrochen rationale Funktion mit einem Nennerpolynom 2. Ordnung mit einer Polgüte von 1 und einem Zählerpolynom 2. Ordnung mit einer Polgüte von 1 und einem Zählerpolynom ist, das aus einer Konstanten besteht, dass die Übertragungsfunktion des Frequenzweichenhochpassfilters eine gebrochen rationale Funktion mit einem Nennerpolynom 2. Ordnung mit einer Polgüte von 1 und einem Zählerpolynom ist, das aus dem quadratischen Term p<2> besteht, wobei p = j + die komplexe Frequenzvariable ist, und dass die Polfrequenzen der Nennerpolynome der Übertragungsfunktionen der Hochpass- und Tiefpassfilter jeweils gleich ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 3/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1039778 A1 20000927

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030122

2001-06-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI