Global Patent Index - EP 1039801 A1

EP 1039801 A1 2000-10-04 - 207 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (en)

207 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (de)

207 MENSCHLICHE SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE

Title (fr)

207 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES

Publication

EP 1039801 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98926237 A

Priority

  • US 9811422 W
  • US 4891597 P
  • US 4888297 P
  • US 4889297 P
  • US 4890197 P
  • US 4890097 P
  • US 4889397 P
  • US 4896497 P
  • US 4888497 P
  • US 4889497 P
  • US 4897197 P
  • US 4888597 P
  • US 4937597 P
  • US 4888197 P
  • US 4888097 P
  • US 4889697 P
  • US 4902097 P
  • US 4887697 P
  • US 4889597 P
  • US 4901997 P
  • US 4891697 P
  • US 4897097 P
  • US 4897297 P
  • US 4894997 P
  • US 4897497 P
  • US 4888397 P
  • US 4889797 P
  • US 4889897 P
  • US 4937397 P
  • US 4891797 P
  • US 4896297 P
  • US 4887897 P
  • US 4937497 P
  • US 4887597 P
  • US 4889997 P
  • US 4887797 P
  • US 4896397 P
  • US 5765197 P
  • US 5776997 P
  • US 5764397 P
  • US 5764597 P
  • US 5766897 P
  • US 5763597 P
  • US 5762797 P
  • US 5766797 P
  • US 5766697 P
  • US 5776497 P
  • US 5764497 P
  • US 5776597 P
  • US 5776297 P
  • US 5777597 P
  • US 5763497 P
  • US 5777797 P
  • US 5762897 P
  • US 5777697 P
  • US 5776097 P
  • US 5776197 P
  • US 5777197 P
  • US 5777097 P
  • US 5764997 P
  • US 5777497 P
  • US 5764897 P
  • US 5764297 P
  • US 5762997 P
  • US 5777897 P
  • US 5776397 P
  • US 5758497 P
  • US 5765497 P
  • US 5764697 P
  • US 5766297 P
  • US 5765097 P
  • US 5766197 P
  • US 5764797 P
  • US 7092397 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2291260A1] The present invention relates to 207 novel human secreted proteins and isolated nucleic acids containing the coding regions of the genes encoding such proteins. Also provided are vectors, host cells, antibodies, and recombinant methods for producing human secreted proteins. The invention further relates to diagnostic and therapeutic methods useful for diagnosing and treating disorders related to these novel human secreted proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01N 37/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4702 (2013.01); C07K 14/4718 (2013.01); G01N 33/68 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9854963 A2 19981210; CA 2291260 A1 19981210; EP 1039801 A1 20001004; EP 1039801 A4 20030326

INPADOC legal status


2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOUNG, PAUL

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GREENE, JOHN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FERRIE, ANN, M.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: RUBEN, STEVEN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ROSEN, CRAIG

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HU, JING-SHAN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OLSEN, HENRIK

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: EBNER, REINHARD

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BREWER, LAURIE, A.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MOORE, PAUL, A.

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHI, YANGGU E

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FLORENCE, CHARLES

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FLORENCE, KIMBERLY

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LAFLEUR, DAVID

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NI, JIAN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FAN, PING

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WEI, YING-FEI

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FISCHER, CARRIE

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SOPPET, DANIEL

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LI, YI

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZENG, ZIZHEN

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KYAW, HLA

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YU, GUO-LIANG

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FENG, PING

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DILLON, PATRICK

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ENDRESS, GREGORY

2007-08-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CARTER, KENNETH

2004-08-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040201

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030721

2003-03-26 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20030207

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991214

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE