Global Patent Index - EP 1039815 A1

EP 1039815 A1 2000-10-04 - ADJUSTMENT MECHANISM, BACK COVER AND ARM REST FOR A CHAIR

Title (en)

ADJUSTMENT MECHANISM, BACK COVER AND ARM REST FOR A CHAIR

Title (de)

STELLMECHANIK, RÜCKENBEZUG UND ARMLEHNE FÜR EINEN STUHL

Title (fr)

SYSTEME MECANIQUE DE REGLAGE, GARNITURE DE DOSSIER ET APPUIS-BRAS POUR FAUTEUIL

Publication

EP 1039815 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98946677 A

Priority

IB 9801671 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0022960A1] The adjustment mechanism contains a pneumatic spring that is placed vertically in the underframe, for adjusting height, and a pneumatic spring that is linked to the seat support at one end and the back-rest at the other, for synchronised adjustment of the angle. The pivotable back-rest and the fixed seat support (2) are coupled with each other on the main hinge pin (D) in two hinge connections. The main hinge pin (D) runs above and crosswise over the seat panel (3). The seat panel (3) has guide cranks (32) on its underside, the brackets (23) of the seat support (2) engaging in said guide cranks in such a way that they can slide crosswise to the main hinge pin (D). The front bearing journals (230) of the brackets (23) engage in the guide cranks (32). The seat panel (3) is coupled together with the reclining spring on the mobile hinge pin on the back-rest. The invention also relates to a back cover with a variably positionable lumbar reinforcement insert and height-adjustable arm-rests. The inventive adjustment mechanism offers efficient and comfortable synchronisation between the sequences of movement of the back-rest and the seat panel (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/032

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/40 (2006.01); A47C 1/03 (2006.01); A47C 1/032 (2006.01); A47C 3/026 (2006.01); A47C 3/18 (2006.01); A47C 3/30 (2006.01); A47C 7/46 (2006.01); A47C 7/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03294 (2013.01); A47C 1/03 (2013.01); A47C 1/03255 (2013.01); A47C 1/03272 (2013.01); A47C 1/03283 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0022960A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 0022960 A1 20000427; AT 249772 T 20031015; DE 59809667 D1 20031023; EP 1039815 A1 20001004; EP 1039815 B1 20030917; JP 2002527175 A 20020827; US 6557939 B1 20030506

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59809667

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2004-10-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041025

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-10-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VITRA PATENTE A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20031031

2004-03-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20030917

2004-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2003-12-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031228

2003-12-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59809667

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-10-21 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031021

2003-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: DR. GERHARD ULLRICH C/O AXON PATENT GMBH

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-09-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-09-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-09-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-04-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CHAIR WITH ADJUSTMENT MECHANISM

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020802

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000617

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL