Global Patent Index - EP 1039826 A1

EP 1039826 A1 2000-10-04 - CONTAINER AND CARTRIDGE FOR DISPENSING PAPER PRODUCTS

Title (en)

CONTAINER AND CARTRIDGE FOR DISPENSING PAPER PRODUCTS

Title (de)

BEHÄLTER UND KASETTE ZUM SPENDEN VON PAPIERPRODUKTEN

Title (fr)

RECIPIENT ET CARTOUCHE PERMETTANT DE DISTRIBUER DES ARTICLES EN PAPIER

Publication

EP 1039826 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98963230 A

Priority

  • US 9826702 W
  • US 99166997 A
  • US 15623098 A
  • US 20695698 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930601A1] A container (10) for dispensing individual paper products (12), the container includes a housing (14) including a plurality of exterior walls defining an interior surface (30) and an interior area (28) within the interior surface (30) for receiving a plurality of the paper products (12). A first end wall (40) defines a dispensing throat (32) for permitting removal of paper products (12) from the interior area (28). A mechanism urges paper products within the interior area (28) toward the dispensing throat (32) in a dispensing direction (44). Protrusions (50) extend from the portion of the interior surface on the second (20) and third exterior walls (22) into the interior area (28) for contacting the paper products (12) to oppose the mechanism for urging. The protrusions (50) on the second wall are staggered from the protrusions on the third wall (22) in the dispensing direction (44). Additional protrusions may be disposed on the first wall (18), fourth wall (24) and first end wall (40) proximate the dispensing throat (32). A cartridge (262) may be provided for holding and dispensing paper products (12) from the container (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 10/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/42 (2006.01); B65D 83/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/424 (2013.01); A47K 10/425 (2013.01); A47K 10/427 (2013.01); A47K 2010/428 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930601A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930601 A1 19990624; AU 1829699 A 19990705; AU 751501 B2 20020815; BR 9813576 A 20011226; CA 2310653 A1 19990624; CA 2310653 C 20050802; CN 1139357 C 20040225; CN 1346247 A 20020424; CO 4850583 A1 19991026; DE 69830612 D1 20050721; DE 69830612 T2 20051103; EG 21530 A 20011128; EP 1039826 A1 20001004; EP 1039826 B1 20050615; ES 2241193 T3 20051016; HU 0100143 A2 20010528; HU 0100143 A3 20010628; ID 26860 A 20010215; IL 136771 A 20050725; IL 136771 D0 20010614; JP 2002508198 A 20020319; JP 3814481 B2 20060830; PA 8464801 A1 20000929; PE 01512000 A1 20000228; PL 342687 A1 20010702; SK 9302000 A3 20011203; TR 200001762 T2 20001023; TW 595456 U 20040621

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091216

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091216

2011-04-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110408

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091215

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081229

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081226

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2007-07-27 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1031309

2006-12-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061229

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-11-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051123

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2241193 T3

2005-09-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050915

2005-07-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69830612 P 20050721

2005-06-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-06-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE

2005-06-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-06-15 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-06-15 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050615

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030826

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB GR IT NL PT SE