Global Patent Index - EP 1039870 A1

EP 1039870 A1 2000-10-04 - PORTABLE VETEBROTHERAPY DEVICE FOR LUMBAR DISCAL ELONGATION AND CERVICAL ELONGATION

Title (en)

PORTABLE VETEBROTHERAPY DEVICE FOR LUMBAR DISCAL ELONGATION AND CERVICAL ELONGATION

Title (de)

TRAGBARES WIRBELTHERAPIEGERÄT FÜR LUMBARE SCHEIBENVERLÄNGERUNG UND HALSWIRBELVERLÄNGERUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE VERTEBROTHERAPIE PORTABLE POUR L'ELONGATION DISCALE LOMBAIRE ET L'ELONGATION CERVICALE

Publication

EP 1039870 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98954564 A

Priority

  • FR 9802413 W
  • FR 9714444 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2770998A1] The apparatus has a frame (1) with a pelvic, thoracic and head support carriages (3,4,5). There are harnesses (24,22) and a traction arm (11) connected to a hydraulic actuating cylinder to produce traction in selected parts of the body

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 1/0222 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9925304A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

FR 2770998 A1 19990521; AU 1162799 A 19990607; DE 69808511 D1 20021107; DE 69808511 T2 20030626; EP 1039870 A1 20001004; EP 1039870 B1 20021002; WO 9925304 A1 19990527

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101113

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69808511

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69808511

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101113

2011-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HAGUENAUER CHRISTIAN

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091210

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091215

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030128

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808511 20021107

2002-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI

2002-10-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011023

2001-07-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PORTABLE VERTEBRA-THERAPY DEVICE FOR LUMBAR DISCAL ELONGATION AND CERVICAL ELONGATION

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB LI