Global patent index - EP 1039886 A1

EP 1039886 A1 2000-10-04 - HIV/FIV PROTEASE INHIBITORS HAVING A SMALL P3 RESIDUE

Title (en)

HIV/FIV PROTEASE INHIBITORS HAVING A SMALL P3 RESIDUE

Title (de)

EIN KLEINER P3 REST AUFWEISENDE HIV/FIV PROTEASE HEMMER

Title (fr)

INHIBITEURS DE PROTEASES DE VIH/VIF PRESENTANT UN PETIT RESTE P3

Publication

EP 1039886 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98963800 A

Priority

  • US 9825964 W
  • US 6795997 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9929311A1] With the help of X-ray structural analyses of drug-resistant HIV proteases and molecular modeling, a new type of inhibitor with a small P3 residue has been developed. These inhibitors are effective against HIV and its drug-resistant mutants, as well as FIV. Modification of existing HIV protease inhibitors by reducing the size of the P3 residue has the same effect. This finding provides a new strategy for the development of HIV protease inhibitors effective against the wild type and drug-resistant mutants and further supports that FIV protease is a useful model for drug-resistant HIV proteases, which often are developed through reduction in size of the binding region for the P3 group or the combined P3 and P1 groups.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/045; A61K 31/13; A61K 31/135; A61K 31/165; A61K 31/38; A61K 31/405; A61K 31/47; A61K 38/05; C07C 205/02; C07C 211/09; C07C 215/18; C07D 207/16; C07D 217/16; C07D 217/26; C07D 277/24; C07D 277/28; C07K 5/062; C07K 5/065

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 207/16 (2006.01); C07D 213/40 (2006.01); C07D 217/26 (2006.01); C07D 277/24 (2006.01); C07D 277/28 (2006.01); C07D 401/12 (2006.01); C07K 5/06 (2006.01); C07K 5/062 (2006.01); C07K 5/065 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 213/40 (2013.01); C07D 207/16 (2013.01); C07D 217/26 (2013.01); C07D 277/28 (2013.01); C07D 401/12 (2013.01); C07K 5/06026 (2013.01); C07K 5/06043 (2013.01); C07K 5/06052 (2013.01); C07K 5/0606 (2013.01); C07K 5/06069 (2013.01); C07K 5/06078 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9929311 A1 19990617; AU 1904599 A 19990628; EP 1039886 A1 20001004; EP 1039886 A4 20010516

INPADOC legal status

2009-07-17 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1032907

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2008-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080429

2007-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050224

2001-05-16 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE SCRIPPS RESEARCH INSTITUTE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000710

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000710;LT PAYMENT 20000710;LV PAYMENT 20000710;MK PAYMENT 20000710;RO PAYMENT 20000710;SI PAYMENT 20000710