Global Patent Index - EP 1039919 A1

EP 1039919 A1 2000-10-04 - COMPOSITION FOR IMPROVING MENTAL CAPABILITIES IN MAMMALS

Title (en)

COMPOSITION FOR IMPROVING MENTAL CAPABILITIES IN MAMMALS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG MENTALER FÄHIGKEITEN IN SÄUGETIEREN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION POUR AMELIORER LES CAPACITES MENTALES CHEZ LES MAMMIFERES

Publication

EP 1039919 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99940453 A

Priority

  • IN 9900036 W
  • IN 2658DE1998 A
  • IN 2660DE1998 A
  • IN 146DE1999 A
  • IN 220DE1999 A
  • IN 221DE1999 A
  • IN 222DE1999 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0013696A1] The present invention relates to a highly potent herbal composition for improving overall mental performance in children, adults and mentally deficient people characterized by using extracted active plant materials from Brahmi herb and at least one of the herbs from Acorus calamus and Celestrus paniculatus oil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 35/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/10 (2006.01); A61K 9/14 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 9/28 (2006.01); A61K 9/48 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 36/00 (2006.01); A61K 36/18 (2006.01); A61K 36/185 (2006.01); A61K 36/23 (2006.01); A61K 36/37 (2006.01); A61K 36/882 (2006.01); A61P 3/02 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/12 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 36/37 (2013.01); A61K 36/185 (2013.01); A61K 36/23 (2013.01); A61K 36/882 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 36/185 + A61K 2300/00
  2. A61K 36/23 + A61K 2300/00
  3. A61K 36/37 + A61K 2300/00
  4. A61K 36/882 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0013696A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0013696 A1 20000316; AU 5442599 A 20000327; AU 742556 B2 20020103; CA 2306165 A1 20000316; CN 1277555 A 20001220; EP 1039919 A1 20001004; JP 2002524419 A 20020806

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 35/78 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 25/28 B

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020207

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MURALI, PANCHAPAGESA MUTHUSWAMY, DR.

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PANDITA, MAHARAJ KRISHEN

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DUBEY, GOVIND PRASHAD

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000907

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE