Global patent index - EP 1039950 A1

EP 1039950 A1 2000-10-04 - REGULATOR WITH ARTIFICIAL LOAD TO MAINTAIN REGULATED DELIVERY

Title (en)

REGULATOR WITH ARTIFICIAL LOAD TO MAINTAIN REGULATED DELIVERY

Title (de)

REGLER MIT KÜNSTLICHER LAST ZUR GEWÄHRLEISTUNG EINER REGELMÄSSIGEN VERABREICHUNG

Title (fr)

REGULATEUR AVEC CHARGE ARTIFICIELLE PERMETTANT DE MAINTENIR UN APPORT REGULE

Publication

EP 1039950 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964714 A

Priority

  • US 9826187 W
  • US 6974597 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930773A1] An electrotransport device with a drug delivery regulating apparatus delivers a proper drug dosage rate over time by adapting to variable skin resistance values. The electrotransport device adapts to a decline in skin resistance over a time that the electrotransport device is used, and to different skin resistances at different skin surface locations. One drug delivery regulating apparatus includes a voltage booster, a serially connectable artificial impedance, and a feedback sensor, which are all connected to a controller. This apparatus outputs a load voltage across two electrodes. The controller monitors the output of the feedback sensor to determine the skin resistance, or a load current, or the load voltage. Based on the monitored value, the load voltage across the electrodes is controlled, so that a targeted drug dose rate is maintained even as the initial skin resistance drops over the period that the electrotransport device is used. The artificial impedance is selectively controlled to prevent overdose where the skin resistance falls below a predetermined resistance, such that a load voltage greater than a supply voltage could result in an overdose.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61N 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930773A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930773 A1 19990624; AU 1997699 A 19990705; CA 2314929 A1 19990624; CA 2314929 C 20080902; CN 1154525 C 20040623; CN 1282261 A 20010131; EP 1039950 A1 20001004; JP 2002508228 A 20020319

INPADOC legal status

2012-07-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1031347

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2010-03-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060701

2003-06-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALZA CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020220

2000-11-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALZA CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE