Global Patent Index - EP 1039957 A1

EP 1039957 A1 2000-10-04 - DEVICE FOR FIXING A BOOT ON A SNOWSURF BOARD

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR FIXING A BOOT ON A SNOWSURF BOARD

Title (de)

SKISCHUHBINDUNGSSYSTEM FÜR SNOWBOARD

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION D'UNE CHAUSSURE SUR UN SURF A NEIGE

Publication

EP 1039957 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98946647 A

Priority

  • CH 249097 A
  • IB 9801635 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9921627A1] The invention concerns a fixing device for angular positioning by fast rotation, comprising a toothed base plate (2) fixed on a snowsurf board surface (20) by means of a screw passing through a cap (3) maintaining a plate (1) in free rotation. It is maintained in fixed angular horizontal position by engagement of a lever (4) provided with toothing (10) matching the base plate (2) toothing (7). By exerting pressure on the control member (11) the plate (1) is unlocked thereby becoming free to rotate about the axis (24).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/10 (2012.01); A63C 10/18 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/10 (2013.01); A63C 10/103 (2013.01); A63C 10/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9921627A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9921627 A1 19990506; AT 229362 T 20021215; DE 69810156 D1 20030123; DE 69810156 T2 20030717; EP 1039957 A1 20001004; EP 1039957 B1 20021211

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091019

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081019

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081030

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081020

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081010

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070917

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69810156 20030123

2002-12-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 229362 T 20021215

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EMERY S.A.

2001-07-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI