Global patent index - EP 1039984 A1

EP 1039984 A1 2000-10-04 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR POLISHING WORKPIECES WITH A SIMULTANEOUS SUPERFINISH

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR POLISHING WORKPIECES WITH A SIMULTANEOUS SUPERFINISH

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHLEIFEN VON WERKSTÜCKEN MIT ZUM SCHLEIFEN ZEITPARALLER FEINSTBEARBEITUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR POLIR DES PIECES AVEC SUPERFINITION SIMULTANEE

Publication

EP 1039984 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98948966 A

Priority

  • DE 19756610 A
  • EP 9805808 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19756610A1] The invention relates to a device and method for polishing a workpieces, especially part of a shaft. According to the inventive method, the workpiece is clamped in order to be polished by means of grinding. Its geometry is subsequently rectified according to its dimensions and shape. At least one part of the surface of the workpiece is at least partially superfinished, concurrent with said polishing. The inventive device comprises a workpiece spindle head and a footstock for clamping said workpiece in addition to a grinding unit with a grinding wheel for polishing said workpiece. The grinding unit and the workpiece are moveably mounted and controlled in relation to each other. The inventive device has a microfinishing unit, which can be moved according to the shape of the workpiece so that at least one part of the surface of the workpiece can be microfinished.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 5/00; B24B 27/00; B24B 33/00; B24B 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 5/04 (2006.01); B24B 5/01 (2006.01); B24B 27/00 (2006.01); B24B 33/00 (2006.01); B24B 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 33/00 (2013.01); B24B 5/01 (2013.01); B24B 27/0076 (2013.01); B24B 35/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932258A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756610 A1 19990701; BR 9814312 A 20011127; CA 2315930 A1 19990701; CA 2315930 C 20061031; CN 100366384 C 20080206; CN 1284022 A 20010214; CZ 20002125 A3 20010516; CZ 294498 B6 20050112; EP 1039984 A1 20001004; EP 1039984 B1 20030305; ES 2190608 T3 20030801; JP 2001526120 A 20011218; SK 284498 B6 20050505; SK 9052000 A3 20011008; US 6431954 B1 20020813; WO 9932258 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status

2005-10-26 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-10-26 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPR

- Free Format Text: 20050429

2004-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040929

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040917

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040902

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-01-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: THIELENHAUS TECHNOLOGIES GMBH

- Effective date: 20031203

2004-01-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: EMAG MASCHINENFABRIK GMBHEUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEY

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-10-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2190608

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807412

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020102

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT