Global patent index - EP 1040013 A1

EP 1040013 A1 2000-10-04 - PRINTED PRODUCT

Title (en)

PRINTED PRODUCT

Title (de)

DRUCKPRODUKT

Title (fr)

PRODUIT D'IMPRIMERIE

Publication

EP 1040013 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966552 A

Priority

  • DE 9803698 W
  • DE 19755692 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930909A1] The invention relates to a method for producing a printed product, the aim being to provide a simple means of removing and separating out parts of the printed product. To this end, the product- or part-product webs are perforated longitudinally and/or crosswise (2 to 4, 6 to 9, 11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 1/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930909A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930909 A1 19990624; WO 9930909 B1 19990826; EP 1040013 A1 20001004; EP 1040013 B1 20011004; US 6435092 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status

2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131216

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2015-08-26 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KOENIG & BAUER AG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59801669

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131231

2014-09-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140829

2014-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130117

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-09-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-03-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-11-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801669

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-11-08

2001-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010302

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000708

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI