Global Patent Index - EP 1040016 A1

EP 1040016 A1 2000-10-04 - PENCIL SHARPENER

Title (en)

PENCIL SHARPENER

Title (de)

STIFTSPITZMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A POINTE AVEC TIGE

Publication

EP 1040016 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98964450 A

Priority

  • DE 19756399 A
  • EP 9807649 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19756399C1] The invention relates to a pencil sharpener, comprising a clamping chuck (1) that feeds a pencil rotationally fixed therein to a rotating milling device. The clamping chuck (1) comprises a plurality of locating tongues (8) pointing almost radially towards a clamp chuck axis (4) to fix the pencil, said tongues being connected to a holding frame(7) surrounding the clamp chuck axis (4) in such a way that they cannot rotate. When the holding frame (7) is pivoted around the clamp chuck axis (4), the locating tongues (8) are bent in the form of a unilaterally tensed bar spring and interacting with stops (15) of a clamp chuck housing (2, 3). The radial inner locating ends (10) of the locating tongues (8) are pivoted outwards to open the clamp chuck (1). The restoring tension of the bent locating tongues (8) is simultaneously used as closing tension for the clamp chuck (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43L 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43L 23/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43L 23/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932306A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756399 C1 19990114; CN 1116992 C 20030806; CN 1282297 A 20010131; EP 1040016 A1 20001004; EP 1040016 B1 20020918; ES 2182393 T3 20030301; JP 2001526139 A 20011218; JP 4350304 B2 20091021; US 6334475 B1 20020101; WO 9932306 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071126

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071127

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2009-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071127

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071126

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080601

2008-08-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080601

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071126

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061117

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20061116

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182393 T3

2003-01-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011122

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT NL