Global Patent Index - EP 1040031 A1

EP 1040031 A1 2000-10-04 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REMOTE ACTIVATION OR CONTROL OF AN AUTOMATIC SEMI-AUTOMATIC PROCESS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR REMOTE ACTIVATION OR CONTROL OF AN AUTOMATIC SEMI-AUTOMATIC PROCESS

Title (de)

METHODE UND VORRICTHUNG ZUR FERNAKTIVIERUNG ODER FERNSTEUERUNG EINES AUTOMATISHEN ODER HALBAUTOMATISCHEN VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'ACTIVATION OU DE CONTR LE DE PROCESSUS AUTOMATIQUE OU SEMI-AUTOMATIQUE A DISTANCE

Publication

EP 1040031 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99946240 A

Priority

  • FR 9902292 W
  • FR 9812261 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2783957A1] The invention concerns a system for remote activation or control of an automatic or semi-automatic process by taking into account data transmitted by radio communication, the conversion and preservation of said data. Said system enables thereby to activate or deactivate automatic or semiautomatic processes such as immobilising, stopping the operation, preventing any vehicle or equipment from starting or functioning, but also enables to control the timed use over time intervals predetermined or to be transmitted by said data, punctually and cyclically. By extension, said system can also transmit to the users of the vehicle or of the equipment signals or data concerning the condition of the vehicle or equipment and the reasons for triggering the processes or their condition.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 25/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08C 17/02 (2013.01); G08C 2201/93 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0018620A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2783957 A1 20000331; AU 5868199 A 20000417; EP 1040031 A1 20001004; WO 0018620 A1 20000406

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-10-15 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030717

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE