Global Patent Index - EP 1040061 A1

EP 1040061 A1 2000-10-04 - DEVICE FOR INFLUENCING SIGNATURES BY ELECTROSTATIC MEANS

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR INFLUENCING SIGNATURES BY ELECTROSTATIC MEANS

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM ELEKTROSTATISCHEN BEEINFLUSSEN VON SIGNATUREN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR INFLUENCER DES SIGNATURES PAR VOIE ELECTROSTATIQUE

Publication

EP 1040061 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966538 A

Priority

  • DE 9803659 W
  • DE 19755745 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19755745A1] The invention relates to an electrostatic device with a flat charging electrode (1) for transferring an electrostatic charge to a sheet or a signature. Said device has two conductors (2, 3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/00; B65H 29/00; B65H 45/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/00 (2006.01); B65H 29/00 (2006.01); B65H 45/16 (2006.01); B65H 45/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/167 (2013.01); B65H 5/004 (2013.01); B65H 29/00 (2013.01); B65H 45/18 (2013.01); B65H 2301/5322 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930995A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19755745 A1 19990624; DE 19755745 C2 20020508; EP 1040061 A1 20001004; EP 1040061 B1 20010919; WO 9930995 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-07-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081211

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-09-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-02-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801556 20011025

2001-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000708

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI