Global Patent Index - EP 1040064 A1

EP 1040064 A1 2000-10-04 - GRIPPER FOR FLAT OBJECTS

Title (en)

GRIPPER FOR FLAT OBJECTS

Title (de)

GREIFER FÜR FLÄCHIGE GEGENSTÄNDE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE PREHENSION POUR OBJETS PLANS

Publication

EP 1040064 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98942446 A

Priority

  • CH 9800405 W
  • CH 290097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9930996A1] Gripper for holding flat objects (21), more particularly flexible objects such as single or multiple sheet printing objects, comprising two gripper limbs (11, 12) that can pivot in relation to each other and exert a clamping force on the object held (21) in a closed position and an actuating device engaging at least in one of the gripper limbs (11, 12) to produce a relative pivoting movement of both gripper limbs (11, 12). The actuating device can be displaced from an open to a closed position of the gripper limbs (11, 12) and has at least one sliding part (18) whose translational movement produces a force on at least one gripper limb (11, 12) either in the direction of the open position or in the direction of the closed position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/14 (2006.01); B65H 29/02 (2006.01); B65H 29/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/003 (2013.01); B65H 2301/323 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930996A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9930996 A1 19990624; WO 9930996 A8 20010201; AT 218494 T 20020615; AU 736928 B2 20010809; AU 9059998 A 19990705; BR 9813824 A 20001010; CA 2308849 A1 19990624; CA 2308849 C 20070213; DE 59804371 D1 20020711; DK 1040064 T3 20020708; EP 1040064 A1 20001004; EP 1040064 B1 20020605; ES 2174474 T3 20021101; JP 2004521051 A 20040715; JP 4030959 B2 20080109; NO 20003155 A 20000616; NO 20003155 D0 20000616; NO 314843 B1 20030602; PT 1040064 E 20021129; RU 2207314 C2 20030627; US 6435583 B1 20020820

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150930

2016-04-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59804371

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141203

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-05 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20130930

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130922

2014-04-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120921

2013-05-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 218494

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120921

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120919

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100922

2011-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110914

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110926

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091001

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100921

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100921

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100921

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090926

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FERAG A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050930

2006-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060401

2005-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-21 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050921

2005-05-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-03-21 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-02-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FERAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040930

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-10 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040910

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-09-09 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040909

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-17 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030917

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-11-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2174474

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-10-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-09-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020823

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804371

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-11

2002-07-08 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-06-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL & PARTNER AG

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 218494

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010719

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE