Global Patent Index - EP 1040067 A1

EP 1040067 A1 2000-10-04 - YARN FEEDING DEVICE

Title (en)

YARN FEEDING DEVICE

Title (de)

FADENLIEFERGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN FIL

Publication

EP 1040067 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965279 A

Priority

  • DE 19756243 A
  • EP 9808298 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19756243A1] A yarn-feeding device (F) has a stationary storage drum (2) for a yarn storage (V) which consists of adjacent windings of yarn (Y), a sensor (S) arranged outside the storage drum within a sensor housing (6) and having at least one movable feeler arm (A) which extends with a feeler foot (8a-8c) from its bearing (5) into the path of displacement of the windings along the storage drum and can be displaced by the windings from its base position, a spring arrangement (B) which pushes the feeler arm in the direction of its base position, and a signal-generating scanning device (T) for the position of the feeler arm. The spring arrangement (B) and the scanning device (T) are located on the same side of the bearing (5) as the part (7a-7c) of the feeler arm that carries the feeler foot (8a-8c). Mounting space is thus reduced, even when several sensor functions are ensured, and an extraordinarily compact sensor device can be obtained which can be universally used for different types of yarn-feeding devices.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/367 (2013.01); B65H 2601/524 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9930998A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756243 A1 19990624; CN 1098798 C 20030115; CN 1099364 C 20030122; CN 1108270 C 20030514; CN 1282303 A 20010131; CN 1282304 A 20010131; CN 1285803 A 20010228; EP 1040067 A1 20001004; EP 1040067 B1 20020807; EP 1040069 A1 20001004; EP 1040069 B1 20020807; EP 1047819 A2 20001102; EP 1047819 B1 20020911; KR 100368459 B1 20030124; KR 100368460 B1 20030124; US 6409114 B1 20020625; WO 9930998 A1 19990624; WO 9930999 A1 19990624; WO 9931308 A2 19990624; WO 9931308 A3 19990819

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59805134

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110701

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2004-12-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030508

2003-01-06 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-11-07 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021107

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-09-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59805134

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-12

2002-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-08-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL SE

2002-08-07 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020807

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MAGNUSSON, PATRIK, JONAS

2002-07-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BENGTSSON, ALF

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROPA AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROPA AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011002

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL SE