Global patent index - EP 1040068 A1

EP 1040068 A1 2000-10-04 - YARN STORAGE

Title (en)

YARN STORAGE

Title (de)

FADENSPEICHER

Title (fr)

ACCUMULATEUR DE FIL

Publication

EP 1040068 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966264 A

Priority

  • DE 29721718 U
  • EP 9807991 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9929608A1] The invention relates to a yarn storage device with a storage drum for twisted thread windings, comprising a yarn tension device with a flexible, funnel-shaped carrier body (1) which is prestressed and spring-loaded against the storage drum (6) with a metal coating (3) on a front edge section (5) of said storage drum (6). The yarn (4) can be pulled through the front edge section (5) and the metal coating (3). The front edge section (5) is shaped like a truncated cone on which a metal strip forming the metal coating (3) rests in a flat position. The yarn (4) running in at a sharp angle is impinged upon on a curved yarn section (4') and the metal strip is secured to the carrier body (1) by means of a thin intermediate layer (2) of elastically compressible material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/34 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/366 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929608A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29721718 U1 19990408; EP 1040068 A1 20001004; EP 1040068 B1 20020626; WO 9929608 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121209

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2003-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IROPA A.G.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030327

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804608

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-01

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROPA AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IROPA AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010711

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT