Global Patent Index - EP 1040110 A1

EP 1040110 A1 2000-10-04 - 5-¬4-¬2-(N-METHYL-N-(2-PYRIDYL)AMINO)ETHOXY BENZYL THIAZOLIDINE-2,4-DIONE,MALEIC ACID SALT,HYDRATE AS PHARMACEUTICAL

Title (en)

5-¬4-¬2-(N-METHYL-N-(2-PYRIDYL)AMINO)ETHOXY BENZYL THIAZOLIDINE-2,4-DIONE,MALEIC ACID SALT,HYDRATE AS PHARMACEUTICAL

Title (de)

5-¬4-¬(N-METHYL-N-(2PYRIDYL)AMINO)ÄTHOXY BENZYL THIAZOLIDIN-2,4-DION,MALEINSÄURESALZ,HYDRATE ALS ARZNEIMITTEL

Title (fr)

PRODUIT PHARMACEUTIQUE CONSTITUE PAR UN HYDRATE, SEL DE L'ACIDE MALEIQUE, DE FORMULE 5- 4- 2- (N-METHYL-N- (2-PYRIDYL)AMINO) ETHOXY BENZYL THIAZOLIDINE-2, 4-DIONE

Publication

EP 1040110 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964510 A

Priority

  • EP 9808155 W
  • GB 9726566 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9931095A1] A hydrate of 5-[4-[2- (N-methyl-N- (2-pyridyl)amino) ethoxy]benzyl] thiazolidine-2, 4-dione, maleic acid salt, characterised in that it: (i) comprises water in the range of from 0.4 to 2.5 %w/w; and (ii) provides an infra red spectrum containing peaks at 1749, 1703, 1645, 1623, 1365 and 736 cm<-1>; and/or (iii) provides an X-ray powder diffraction (XRPD) pattern substantially as set out in Figure II and/or (iv) provides a Raman spectrum containing peaks at 3106, 3069, 3002, 2961, 1750, 1718, 1684, 1385, 1335, 1229, 1078, 917, 428 and 349 cm<-1> and/or (iv) provides a solid-state nuclear magnetic resonance spectrum containing chemical shifts substantially as set out in Table I; a process for the preparation of such a compound, a pharmaceutical composition containing such a compound and the use of such a compound or composition in medicine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 417/12; A61K 31/425

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/4427 (2006.01); A61K 31/4439 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 417/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931095A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9931095 A1 19990624; AP 1365 A 20050126; AP 200001831 D0 20000630; AR 017214 A1 20010822; AU 1967999 A 19990705; BG 104603 A 20010330; BG 64988 B1 20061130; BR 9813600 A 20001010; CA 2314107 A1 19990624; CN 101302215 A 20081112; CN 101381367 A 20090311; CN 1281453 A 20010124; CO 4980880 A1 20001127; CZ 20002204 A3 20001115; CZ 299965 B6 20090107; DZ 2681 A1 20040620; EA 004260 B1 20040226; EA 200000654 A1 20001225; EG 22337 A 20021231; EP 1040110 A1 20001004; EP 1661895 A1 20060531; GB 9726566 D0 19980211; HR P20000408 A2 20000831; HR P20000408 B1 20080430; HU 0100509 A2 20020529; HU 0100509 A3 20020628; IL 136424 A 20031210; IL 136424 D0 20010614; IN 192487 B 20040424; JP 2002508373 A 20020319; MA 26580 A1 20041220; MY 135612 A 20080530; NO 20003069 A 20000615; NO 20003069 D0 20000615; NO 317254 B1 20040927; OA 11766 A 20050719; PE 00582000 A1 20000226; PL 341146 A1 20010326; RS 50126 B 20090325; SA 1415 B1 20061011; SK 286618 B6 20090205; SK 9172000 A3 20010118; TR 200001799 T2 20010122; TR 9802625 A2 19991021; TR 9802625 A3 19991021; TW 509690 B 20021111; UA 72198 C2 20050215; UY 25304 A1 20001229; YU 36300 A 20040312; ZA 9811506 B 20001106

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 5-??4-??2-(N-METHYL-N-(2-PYRIDYL)AMINO)ETHOXY BENZYL THIAZOLIDINE-2,4-DIONE,MALEIC ACID SALT,HYDRATE AS PHARMACEUTICAL

2007-07-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032905

2006-08-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051014

2002-09-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010525

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000613

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000613;LT PAYMENT 20000613;LV PAYMENT 20000613;MK PAYMENT 20000613;RO PAYMENT 20000613;SI PAYMENT 20000613