Global Patent Index - EP 1040115 A1

EP 1040115 A1 2000-10-04 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF TRI-NUCLEAR MOLYBDENUM-SULFUR COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS LUBRICANT ADDITIVES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF TRI-NUCLEAR MOLYBDENUM-SULFUR COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS LUBRICANT ADDITIVES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON DREIKERNIGEN MOLYBDENUM-SCHWEFEL VERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS SCHMIERMITTELZUSÄTZE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE COMPOSES TRINUCLEAIRES DE MOLYBDENE-SOUFRE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'ADDITIFS POUR LUBRIFIANT

Publication

EP 1040115 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98965819 A

Priority

  • EP 9808124 W
  • GB 9814967 A
  • US 99005397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9931113A1] Oil-soluble or oil-dispersible trinuclear molybdenum-sulfur compounds are made by reacting less than three, such as 1.5 to 2.5, preferably 2 to 2.1, molar equivalents of a disulfide with one molar equivalent of a compound containing the [Mo3S13]<2->ion. The trinuclear compounds include S-containing ligands that are derived from the disulfide reactant via cleavage of the disulfide bond; the ligands are bound to the core via the S atoms.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07F 11/00; C10M 159/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07F 11/00 (2006.01); C10M 135/18 (2006.01); C10M 137/10 (2006.01); C10M 139/00 (2006.01); C10M 159/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 159/18 (2013.01); C07F 11/005 (2013.01); C10M 135/18 (2013.01); C10M 137/10 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2227/09 (2013.01); C10N 2210/06 (2013.01); C10N 2230/06 (2013.01); C10N 2240/10 (2013.01); C10N 2240/101 (2013.01); C10N 2240/104 (2013.01); C10N 2240/106 (2013.01); C10N 2270/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931113A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9931113 A1 19990624; AU 2160799 A 19990705; CA 2313408 A1 19990624; DE 69824886 D1 20040805; DE 69824886 T2 20050630; EP 1040115 A1 20001004; EP 1040115 B1 20040630; JP 2002508384 A 20020319; JP 4528439 B2 20100818

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081208

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071208

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081208

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071204

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071106

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *INFINEUM USA L.P.

- Effective date: 20061231

2007-09-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070701

2007-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2006-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-09 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051109

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69824886 P 20040805

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021010

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEUM USA L.P.

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MCCONNACHIE, JONATHAN, MARTIN

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STIEFEL, EDWARD, IRA

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ARUNASALAM, VELAUTHA, CUMARAN

2000-12-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BELL, IAN, ALEXANDER, WESTON

2000-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEUM USA L.P.

2000-11-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEUM UK LTD

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000602

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL