Global patent index - EP 1040201 A1

EP 1040201 A1 2000-10-04 - SINGLE CHAIN MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY FUSION REAGENTS THAT REGULATE TRANSCRIPTION IN VIVO

Title (en)

SINGLE CHAIN MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY FUSION REAGENTS THAT REGULATE TRANSCRIPTION IN VIVO

Title (de)

EINKETTIGE MONOKLONAL-ANTIKÖRPER-FUSIONS-AGENTIEN DIE DIE IN VIVO TRANSKRIPTION REGULIEREN

Title (fr)

REACTIFS DE FUSION D'ANTICORPS MONOCLONAL A CHAINE UNIQUE REGULANT UNE TRANSCRIPTION IN VIVO

Publication

EP 1040201 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97949553 A

Priority

US 9721407 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928502A1] A method of screening a DNA construct library for a single chain monoclonal antibody fusion reagent capable of binding a transcriptional associated biomolecule in vivo is described. Single chain monoclonal antibody fusion reagents capable of binding transcriptional associated biomolecules in vivo are provided. Single chain monoclonal antibody fusion reagents which are capable of regulating transcription in vivo are also provided. Therapeutic methods for regulating the transcription of a gene in vivo are also described. A method is further provided for screening a plurality of compounds for specific binding affinity with a single chain monoclonal antibody fusion reagent. A method is also described for diagnosing a physiological disorder manifested by an abnormal level of a transcription associated biomolecule. A DNA construct (pVP16Zeo) as well as primers for the construction and screening of single chain monoclonal antibody fusion reagent libraries to facilitate the isolation and production of single chain monoclonal antibody fusion reagents in yeast and E.coli are also provided. A kit for screening a DNA construct library for a single chain monoclonal antibody fusion reagent capable of binding a transcriptional associated biomolecule in vivo is also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; A61K 39/395; A61K 39/40; A61K 39/42; C07K 16/00; C12P 21/08; C12Q 1/40; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/573

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 15/10 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/1055 (2013.01); C07K 16/18 (2013.01); C12Q 1/6897 (2013.01); A61K 2039/505 (2013.01); C07K 2317/622 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928502 A1 19990610; AU 3587599 A 19990616; EP 1040201 A1 20001004; EP 1040201 A4 20011121

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040902

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021210

2001-11-21 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2001-11-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 12N 15/10 A, 7C 12N 15/62 B, 7C 07K 16/18 B, 7C 12Q 1/68 B, 7G 01N 33/50 B, 7A 61K 39/395 B, 7G 01N 33/573 B

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HOEFFLER, JAMES, P.

2000-11-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RUSSELL, MARIJANE

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL