Global Patent Index - EP 1040206 A1

EP 1040206 A1 2000-10-04 - RUST-RESISTANT CONSTRUCTIONAL STEEL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

RUST-RESISTANT CONSTRUCTIONAL STEEL AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

NICHROSTENDER BAUSTAHL UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

ACIER DE CONSTRUCTION INOXYDABLE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1040206 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966508 A

Priority

  • DE 9803583 W
  • DE 19755409 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19755409A1] The invention relates to a method for producing rust-resistant constructional steels which can be used for sheets, strips, pipes, bars etc., in a wide range of areas of application. One preferred use for the inventive steels is the production of smooth or ribbed, weldable concrete steels, i.e. rust-resistant reinforcement steels for reinforced concrete construction. The aim of the invention is to produce rust-resistant, weldable constructional steels which can be classified as martensitic or ferritic-martensitic, which can be manufactured without annealing and cold-forming according a simplified method, and which have at least equivalent material characteristics. According to the invention, the desired characteristics of the rust-resistant constructional steels, such as resistance and strength characteristics, weldability and resistance to corrosion are obtained by means of thermomechanical treatment using the rolling heat instead of annealing and subsequent cold-forming. On cooling, the rust-resistant martensitic or ferritic-martensitic constructional steels were found to have obtained the same or better properties directly from the rolling heat as if they had been heat-treated and then cold-formed. The invention therefore provides a method for producing rust-resistant constructional or concrete steel without annealing and cold-forming, and therefore more cheaply.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/08; C21D 8/00; C22C 38/04; C22C 38/42; C22C 38/44; C22C 38/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/06 (2006.01); C21D 8/08 (2006.01); B21B 1/16 (2006.01); B21B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/065 (2013.01); C21D 8/08 (2013.01); B21B 1/163 (2013.01); B21B 3/02 (2013.01); C21D 2211/005 (2013.01); C21D 2211/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931283A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19755409 A1 19990617; AT 214107 T 20020315; BR 9813553 A 20001003; CN 1281514 A 20010124; DK 1040206 T3 20020617; EP 1040206 A1 20001004; EP 1040206 B1 20020306; ES 2172262 T3 20020916; WO 9931283 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091208

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110314

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091208

2011-04-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091207

2011-03-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110328

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100104

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091207

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091207

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091207

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091207

2010-08-09 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-07-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-07-14 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100701

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20081222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20081222

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-07-01 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VON MOOS STAHL A.G.

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021209

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-10-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2172262 T3

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020521

2002-06-06 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020606

2002-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2002-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803308 20020411

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-06 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020306

2002-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214107 T 20020315

2002-01-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VON MOOS STAHL AG

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010518

2001-07-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR PRODUCING RUST-RESISTANT FERRITIC OR FERRITIC-MARTENSITIC CONSTRUCTIONAL STEEL

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE