Global Patent Index - EP 1040214 A1

EP 1040214 A1 2000-10-04 - AUXILIARY AGENT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CELLULOSE FIBERS

Title (en)

AUXILIARY AGENT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CELLULOSE FIBERS

Title (de)

HILFSMITTEL FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG VON CELLULOSEFASERN

Title (fr)

ADJUVANTS POUR LA PRODUCTION DE FIBRES CELLULOSIQUES

Publication

EP 1040214 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963528 A

Priority

  • DE 19754314 A
  • EP 9807700 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19754314A1] The invention relates to a method for producing cellulose fibers according to the viscose method, whereby reaction products of the nucleophilic ring opening of epoxides are added as modifiers. Said epoxides are comprised of formula (I) in which R<1> represents a linear or branched aliphatic alkyl radical having 1 to 22 C-atoms with compounds of formula (II) in which R<2> and R<3>, independent of one another, represent a radical (CnH2n-O)m-H or a linear or branched saturated or unsaturated alkyl radical having 1 to 22 C-atoms or hydrogen, n represents the value 2 or 3 and m represents a value between 1 and 20.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 2/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 2/06 (2006.01); D01F 2/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 2/06 (2013.01); D01F 2/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929937A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19754314 A1 19990610; AT 233837 T 20030315; EP 1040214 A1 20001004; EP 1040214 B1 20030305; US 6475419 B1 20021105; WO 9929937 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091128

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT