Global Patent Index - EP 1040227 A1

EP 1040227 A1 2000-10-04 - SLIT NOZZLE FOR COATING STRIPS OF MATERIAL, ESPECIALLY PAPER OR BOARD STRIPS, WITH A PIGMENT COATING

Title (en)

SLIT NOZZLE FOR COATING STRIPS OF MATERIAL, ESPECIALLY PAPER OR BOARD STRIPS, WITH A PIGMENT COATING

Title (de)

SCHLITZDÜSE ZUM BESCHICHTEN VON MATERIALBAHNEN, INSBESONDERE PAPIER- ODER KARTONBAHNEN MIT PIGMENTSTREICHFARBE

Title (fr)

BUSE FENDUE POUR ENDUIRE DES BANDES DE MATERIAU, NOTAMMENT DES BANDES DE PAPIER OU DE CARTON AVEC UNE SAUCE DE COUCHAGE AU PIGMENT

Publication

EP 1040227 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98956850 A

Priority

  • DE 19755625 A
  • EP 9806587 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19755625A1] The use of slit nozzles to coat paper or board strips (B) is known. Said nozzles comprise a slit-like outlet channel (7) and a distribution chamber (3) which extend over the working width, said distribution chamber being attached to the outlet duct (7). According to the invention, at least two feed channels (16) are attached to the distribution chamber (3), each of which comprises a device (22) to regulate the volumetric flow of the coating material being fed. The flow conditions of the volumetric flows being fed in the distribution chamber (3) can be influenced in order to ensure even and troublefree coating when conditions vary, i.e. fluctuations in viscosity or thickness of the coating.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 23/32; D21H 23/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/32 (2006.01); D21H 23/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 23/32 (2013.01); B05C 5/0262 (2013.01); D21H 23/48 (2013.01); Y10S 118/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931321A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19755625 A1 19990701; AT 230815 T 20030115; EP 1040227 A1 20001004; EP 1040227 B1 20030108; US 6471775 B1 20021029; WO 9931321 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081018

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081017

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081017

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081017

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-06-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071016

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071012

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071026

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071015

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20071015

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031009

2003-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-09 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-02-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806893 P 20030213

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-01-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030108

2003-01-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230815 T 20030115

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010601

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000413

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE