Global Patent Index - EP 1040228 A1

EP 1040228 A1 2000-10-04 - PLASTIC PERMEATED POROUS SUBSTRATE BASED PRODUCT

Title (en)

PLASTIC PERMEATED POROUS SUBSTRATE BASED PRODUCT

Title (de)

ERZEUGNIS AUS EINEM PORÖSEN TRÄGER, DER VON EINEM KUNSTSTOFF DURCHSETZT IST

Title (fr)

PRODUIT CONSTITUE D'UN SUPPORT POREUX TRAVERSE PAR UNE MATIERE PLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 1040228 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965776 A

Priority

  • DE 19754619 A
  • EP 9807936 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19754619A1] A film-like product is produced in such a way that an emulsion paint (12) which can be sublimated and a plastic, especially a polyolefin (14) are applied to a porous substrate (10) and the plastic or polyolefin seeps into the porous substrate as a result of the effect of heat and the emulsion paint is diffused.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21H 25/06; D21H 17/35; D21H 19/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06N 7/06 (2006.01); B32B 27/32 (2006.01); D21H 17/35 (2006.01); D21H 19/22 (2006.01); D21H 25/06 (2006.01); D21H 27/20 (2006.01); D21H 27/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21H 19/22 (2013.01); D21H 17/35 (2013.01); D21H 25/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9929959A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19754619 A1 19990624; CA 2314183 A1 19990617; CA 2314183 C 20061003; EP 1040228 A1 20001004; EP 1040228 B1 20030305; ES 2190138 T3 20030716; JP 2001526332 A 20011218; WO 9929959 A1 19990617

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071207

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051116

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061209

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2008-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20061209

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061207

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-09-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070701

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20061207

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2007-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051230

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051116

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051116

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-11-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2190138

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807413

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUSH INDUSTRIES, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MZE ENGINEERING FUER VERFAHRENSTECHNIK GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010611

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL