Global Patent Index - EP 1040233 A1

EP 1040233 A1 2000-10-04 - ROAD STEM CASE

Title (en)

ROAD STEM CASE

Title (de)

STRASSENHALMKASTEN

Title (fr)

PUITS ENCASTRE DANS LA CHAUSSEE

Publication

EP 1040233 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98962642 A

Priority

  • HU 9800103 W
  • HU 9700323 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932735A1] The invention relates to a road stem case with a housing (1) which forms a protective casing and is sunk in a road surface such that it cannot move. The road stem case also has a cover which is arranged such that it can move relative to the housing (1). The cover fits in a seat (5) formed inside said housing (1), whereby the seat (5) is constructed with a narrowing conical shape. In addition, a through opening (7) is configured in a closing plate (6) which closes the base of the road stem case, and a groove (8) opens into said through opening (7). A track (11) is incorporated in the lower surface of the closing plate (6) on both sides of the groove (8), and the cover (2) is constructed such that it has a narrowing conical dimension which exceeds the conicality of the seat (5), whereby the cover (2) contacts the seat (5) along a line. A shaft (12) protrudes away from the underside of the cover (2) and is concentrically arranged in the opening (7) such that it can twist. A pin (13) which projects outward from the side of the shaft (12) is smaller than the groove (8) in the seat (5) and can thus be guided through via said groove (8). The shaft (12) is movably guided in said tracks (11) when the cover (2) is in a placed position in the seat (5). At least one recess (14) is incorporated in the surface of the cover (2) for an authorized twisting and/or removal of the cover (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03B 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 29/14 (2006.01); E03B 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03B 9/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932735A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932735 A1 19990701; DE 59809000 D1 20030814; EP 1040233 A1 20001004; EP 1040233 B1 20030709; HU 1595 U 19990830; HU 9700323 V0 19980302; RO 119555 B1 20041230; SK 9292000 A3 20010118

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *JUTEC MUSZAKI SZOLGALTATO KFT.

- Effective date: 20061231

2007-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-01-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060116

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051212

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-11-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTBUERO PAUL ROSENICH AG

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59809000 P 20030814

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI

2003-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JUHASZ, LAESZLO

2003-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KERTESZ, LAJOS

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE LI