Global patent index - EP 1040238 A1

EP 1040238 A1 2000-10-04 - SHEARING REINFORCEMENT FOR FLAT CEILINGS AND DOWEL STRIP

Title (en)

SHEARING REINFORCEMENT FOR FLAT CEILINGS AND DOWEL STRIP

Title (de)

SCHUBBEWEHRUNG FÜR FLACHDECKEN UND DÜBELLEISTE HIERFÜR

Title (fr)

ARMATURE DE CISAILLEMENT POUR PLAFONDS PLATS ET PROFILE A GOUJONS CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1040238 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966280 A

Priority

  • DE 19756358 A
  • EP 9808031 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19756358A1] A shearing reinforcement arranged in a bearing area for flat ceilings, comprising several dowel strips (6) arranged in a substantially radial position with respect to a stay (2) and respectively consisting of a dowel rail (7) and several vertical, parallel and interspaced dowels. The dowels (8,8') have a respective oblong shank (9,9,)and an enlarged head (10) at least on one end opposite to the rail. The diameter of the shanks (9) of the dowels (8) which are adjacent to the stay (2) is greater than the diameter of the shanks (9') of the dowels (8') which are located further away from the stay (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/06; E04B 5/43

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/48 (2006.01); E04B 5/43 (2006.01); E04C 5/00 (2006.01); E04C 5/06 (2006.01); E04C 5/16 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

E04B (2006.01); E04C (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/0645 (2013.01); E04B 5/43 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932737A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756358 A1 19990701; AT 235620 T 20030415; CA 2313518 A1 19990701; CA 2313518 C 20060207; CZ 20002216 A3 20010117; CZ 297223 B6 20061011; DK 1040238 T3 20030610; EP 1040238 A1 20001004; EP 1040238 B1 20030326; ES 2191370 T3 20030901; HK 1031752 A1 20030815; JP 2001527177 A 20011225; JP 4101461 B2 20080618; NO 20003153 A 20000616; NO 20003153 D0 20000616; PL 196257 B1 20071231; PL 341207 A1 20010326; US 6327832 B1 20011211; WO 9932737 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-04-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR2

- Effective date: 20091014

2010-02-17 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20091014

2010-01-04 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: HALFEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

- Effective date: 20091111

2009-11-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HALFEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2008-09-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: HALFEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2008-08-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2008-02-29 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: PK

2007-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HALFEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2007-08-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2007-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHE KAHNEISEN GESELLSCHAFT MBH

2007-01-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHE KAHNEISEN GESELLSCHAFT MBH

- Effective date: 20031219

2004-05-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHE KAHNEISEN GESELLSCHAFT MBH

2004-02-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: DEUTSCHE KAHNEISEN GESELLSCHAFT MBH

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-12-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-12-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2191370

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-06-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-06-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-06-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-05-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030401286

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59807680

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-03-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HALFEN GMBH & CO. KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000226

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT SE