Global Patent Index - EP 1040243 A1

EP 1040243 A1 2000-10-04 - ELECTRICAL DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE RELEASE OF A ROTATING SHAFT, IN PARTICULAR OF A LOCK AND LOCK EQUIPPED WITH SAME

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE RELEASE OF A ROTATING SHAFT, IN PARTICULAR OF A LOCK AND LOCK EQUIPPED WITH SAME

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTRIEGELUNG EINER DREHENDEN WELLE, INSBESONDERE EINES SCHLOSSES UND SCHLOSS MIT SOLCHER VORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ELECTRIQUE DE COMMANDE DE DEVERROUILLAGE D'UN ARBRE TOURNANT, NOTAMMENT D'UNE SERRURE ET SERRURE EQUIPEE DE CE DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1040243 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98962472 A

Priority

  • FR 9802742 W
  • FR 9716541 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2772817A1] The electric lock release operates on the rod attached to the door handle (10), with a mechanism (46,50) to lock or release the rotation of the rod. When an authorisation signal is received from the associated card reader, a current actuated solenoid (32) displaces the mechanism to allow rotation of the rod so the door can be opened when the handle is turned.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/06 (2006.01); E05B 15/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0669 (2013.01); E05B 15/004 (2013.01); E05B 47/0006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932744A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2772817 A1 19990625; FR 2772817 B1 20000225; AU 1763899 A 19990712; DE 69831688 D1 20051027; DE 69831688 T2 20060622; EP 1040243 A1 20001004; EP 1040243 B1 20050921; ES 2251117 T3 20060416; WO 9932744 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091216

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110322

2011-04-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110404

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091215

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100701

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091215

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081110

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090225

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060622

2006-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2251117 T3

2006-01-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-10-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69831688 P 20051027

2005-09-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2005-09-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010629

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB