Global Patent Index - EP 1040244 A1

EP 1040244 A1 2000-10-04 - ROTARY LATCH LOCK, ESPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

ROTARY LATCH LOCK, ESPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

DREHFALLENSCHLOSS, INSBESONDERE FÜR FAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

SERRURE A PENE TOURNANT, EN PARTICULIER POUR VEHICULES

Publication

EP 1040244 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966281 A

Priority

  • DE 19755695 A
  • EP 9808034 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19755695A1] The invention relates to a rotary latch lock comprising a rotary latch (20) which receives a closing member (10), whereby said latch is spring-loaded (22) in an open position and retained by a pivoting spring-loaded catch (30) in a closed position. The locking catch (30) can also be mechanically shifted from closed position (whereby the latch is retained) to a release position by means of inside handles (24), outside handles (25) and security handles (26) in addition to other, possibly motorised means (70). Said lock encompasses three different states which are differentiated from each other in that all handles (24, 25, 26) or only some of these handles can be actuated from the inside. A release lever (35), acting mechanically upon the catch (30), is used. Said lever is connected to a control lever (28) which can be correspondingly shifted into three pivoting positions. According to the respective pivoting position, a mobile-mounted release-lever (35) driver (44) can be placed by the control lever (28) in a position whereby the various handles can become operative or inoperative according to choice.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 65/20; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 5/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 77/24 (2014.01); E05B 77/28 (2014.01); E05B 81/14 (2014.01); E05B 81/06 (2014.01); E05B 81/08 (2014.01); E05B 85/00 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 77/24 (2013.01); E05B 77/28 (2013.01); E05B 77/245 (2013.01); E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 81/08 (2013.01); E05B 85/01 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10S 292/27 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931340A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19755695 A1 19990617; AU 2269699 A 19990705; AU 736247 B2 20010726; BR 9814292 A 20001010; CN 1282399 A 20010131; EP 1040244 A1 20001004; EP 1040244 B1 20011114; ES 2163309 T3 20020116; JP 2002508463 A 20020319; KR 20010033082 A 20010425; PT 1040244 E 20020531; US 6419286 B1 20020716; WO 9931340 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171228

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-01-03 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59802175

- Effective date: 20121105

2006-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20041211

2005-12-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051210

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-08-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20050613

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041210

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2005-06-13 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050613

2004-12-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041211

2004-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041211

2004-12-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041210

2003-12-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031231

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031229

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031224

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031216

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-12 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20031212

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031211

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020208

2002-03-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020208

2002-02-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2163309 T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802175 20011220

2001-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE