Global Patent Index - EP 1040249 A1

EP 1040249 A1 2000-10-04 - DEVICE FOR MOVING AN ELONGATED OBJECT, IN PARTICULAR A RISER PART OR A DRILL PIPE CASSETTE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR MOVING AN ELONGATED OBJECT, IN PARTICULAR A RISER PART OR A DRILL PIPE CASSETTE

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM FÖRDERN EINES LÄNGLICHEN GEGENSTANDES, INSBESONDERE EINES RISERELEMENTES ODER EINES STAPELS VON BOHRGESTÄNGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR DEPLACER UN OBJET ALLONGE, EN PARTICULIER UN TUBE PROLONGATEUR OU UNE CASSETTE DE TIGE DE FORAGE

Publication

EP 1040249 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98962688 A

Priority

  • NL 9800715 W
  • NL 1007799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9931346A1] The present invention relates to a device for moving an elongated object, in particular a riser part (10) or a drill pipe cassette, between a storage space and a drilling tower or drilling mast (6) of a drilling vessel or drilling platform, said device comprising: a main frame (25) which is mounted so that it is movable at right angles to the longitudinal direction thereof on the deck of said drilling vessel or said drilling platform, a top carriage (23) which is fixed on the main frame and is movable in the longitudinal direction thereof, and a guide frame (22) which is fixed on the top carriage and can pivot about a horizontal axis relative to the top carriage.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 19/14; E21B 19/15

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 19/14 (2006.01); E21B 19/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 19/14 (2013.01); E21B 19/155 (2013.01); B63B 35/4413 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931346A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK FI FR GB IE IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9931346 A1 19990624; AT 203090 T 20010715; AU 1786399 A 19990705; BR 9813593 A 20001010; DE 69801120 D1 20010816; EP 1040249 A1 20001004; EP 1040249 B1 20010711; NL 1007799 C2 19990617; NO 20002954 A 20000719; NO 20002954 D0 20000609; NO 321967 B1 20060731

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151215

2016-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151215

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-02 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140306 AND 20140312

2002-10-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-07-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-12-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011217

2001-10-12 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011012

2001-10-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-10-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-08-22 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69801120 20010816

2001-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FI FR GB IE IT SE

2001-07-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-07-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-07-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-07-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 203090 T 20010715

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK FI FR GB IE IT SE