Global Patent Index - EP 1040250 A1

EP 1040250 A1 2000-10-04 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING A TOOL IN A WELLBORE

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR POSITIONING A TOOL IN A WELLBORE

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ORTUNG EINES WERKZEUGS IN EINEM ERDBOHRLOCH

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE POSITIONNER UN OUTIL DANS UN PUITS DE FORAGE

Publication

EP 1040250 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964048 A

Priority

  • GB 9726524 A
  • GB 9800344 A
  • US 9826883 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2332462A] A wellbore positioning system for enabling the easy positioning of downhole tools comprises a series of spiral guide slots (5) which are formed on the inner surface of casing tubulars (1). A locating tool (7) is run into the wellbore attached to the downhole tool to be positioned such as a whipstock (10). The locating tool carries a spring loaded key (15) on its outer surface which is forced outwards by the spring and engages with the guide slot when they meet. The locating tool subsequently travels down into the wellbore following a spiral path until the key reaches the end of the guide slot. The downhole tool is now is the desired position. Several such guide slots may be located at different depths and rotational positions in the casing string. These different guide slots may have differing widths or profiles so as only to allow the engagement of predetermined keys thereby allowing the desired depth and rotational orientation of the tool to be accurately achieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 23/02; E21B 7/06; E21B 47/09

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/06 (2006.01); E21B 23/02 (2006.01); E21B 47/09 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/061 (2013.01); E21B 23/02 (2013.01); E21B 47/09 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931348A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

GB 2332462 A9; GB 2332462 A 19990623; GB 2332462 B 20020522; GB 9827734 D0 19990210; AU 1925299 A 19990705; CA 2315233 A1 19990624; CA 2315233 C 20070612; DE 69829210 D1 20050407; DE 69829210 T2 20060406; EP 1040250 A1 20001004; EP 1040250 B1 20050302; NO 20002920 A 20000802; NO 20002920 D0 20000607; NO 315719 B1 20031013; WO 9931348 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151110

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151208

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69829210 P 20050407

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2004-12-01 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040407

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC.

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TARGET WELL CONTROL LIMITED

2001-09-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WEATHERFORD/LAMB, INC.

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL