Global Patent Index - EP 1040268 A1

EP 1040268 A1 2000-10-04 - TURBOCHARGER WITH INTEGRAL TURBINE EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION CONTROL VALVE AND EXHAUST GAS BYPASS VALVE

Title (en)

TURBOCHARGER WITH INTEGRAL TURBINE EXHAUST GAS RECIRCULATION CONTROL VALVE AND EXHAUST GAS BYPASS VALVE

Title (de)

TURBOLADER MIT IN DER TURBINE INTEGRIERTEM ABGASRÜCKFÜHRUNGSVENTIL UND ABBLASEVENTIL

Title (fr)

TURBOCOMPRESSEUR AVEC SOUPAPE DE COMMANDE DE LA RECIRCULATION DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT DE LA TURBINE ET SOUPAPE DE DERIVATION DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT INTEGREES

Publication

EP 1040268 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98963992 A

Priority

  • US 9826760 W
  • US 6815897 P
  • US 21184398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9931376A1] A turbocharger is provided with an integral exhaust gas recirculation (EGR) chamber (26) and valve (40) contained within the turbine housing casting in conjunction with a conventional exhaust gas bypass or wastegate system. An exhaust gas back pressure control valve (12) is also provided integral to the exhaust gas outlet for EGR flow control.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 37/00 (2006.01); F02B 39/00 (2006.01); F02M 25/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 26/615 (2016.02); F02M 26/10 (2016.02); F02M 26/16 (2016.02); F02M 26/51 (2016.02); F02M 26/05 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931376A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9931376 A1 19990624; AU 1920699 A 19990705; BR 9815818 A 20011226; CN 1284152 A 20010214; DE 69806506 D1 20020814; DE 69806506 T2 20021212; EP 1040268 A1 20001004; EP 1040268 B1 20020710; JP 2002508473 A 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151207

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-23 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 69806506

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131121

2003-07-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030411

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69806506

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-14

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2002-07-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010807

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE