Global Patent Index - EP 1040276 A1

EP 1040276 A1 2000-10-04 - BLOWER

Title (en)

BLOWER

Title (de)

LÜFTER

Title (fr)

SOUFFLANTE

Publication

EP 1040276 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965857 A

Priority

  • DE 19756859 A
  • EP 9808362 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19756859A1] A fan for assembly on a wall (15) has a housing with a chamber incorporating its fan wheel (23) and a motor driving (35) it which is located in an accommodation chamber screening its electrical terminals. The accommodation chamber (32) is located outside the chamber incorporating the fan wheel and is fixed to the housing. The accommodation chamber is generally inaccessible after the assembly of the housing on the wall. The chamber for the fan wheel and the accommodation chamber for the motor are located one behind the other in the direction of the drive axis of the motor, and are separated from one another by a wall (25).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 25/08; F04D 29/60; F04D 29/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/08 (2006.01); F04D 29/60 (2006.01); F04D 29/62 (2006.01); F04D 29/64 (2006.01); F25D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/06 (2013.01); F04D 25/08 (2013.01); F04D 29/602 (2013.01); F04D 29/646 (2013.01); F25B 2500/13 (2013.01); F25D 2317/0681 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932793A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756859 A1 19990624; BR 9813761 A 20001003; CN 1111653 C 20030618; CN 1282406 A 20010131; EP 1040276 A1 20001004; EP 1040276 B1 20020612; ES 2178306 T3 20021216; PL 192529 B1 20061130; PL 341103 A1 20010326; RU 2176332 C1 20011127; TR 200001708 T2 20001121; WO 9932793 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121219

2014-03-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140307

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121218

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121218

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59804463

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130830

2013-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121218

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120103

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111219

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101231

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101227

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101221

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-08-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20100723

2005-08-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-12-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041219

2003-12-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031229

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178306 T3

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804463 20020718

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000719

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011105

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000719