Global Patent Index - EP 1040311 A1

EP 1040311 A1 2000-10-04 - INTEGRATED CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR HEATING IGNITION MATERIAL AND USE OF THIS INTEGRATED CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

INTEGRATED CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT FOR HEATING IGNITION MATERIAL AND USE OF THIS INTEGRATED CIRCUIT ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

INTEGRIERTE SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG ZUM AUFHEIZEN VON ZÜNDMATERIAL SOWIE VERWENDUNG EINER SOLCHEN INTEGRIERTEN SCHALTUNGSANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

CONFIGURAITON DE CIRCUIT INTEGRE DESTINEE AU CHAUFFAGE D'UN MATERIAU D'AMOR AGE ET UTILISATION D'UNE TELLE CONFIGURATION DE CIRCUIT INTEGRE

Publication

EP 1040311 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965613 A

Priority

  • DE 9803672 W
  • DE 19756563 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9932846A1] An integrated circuit arrangement has both an ignition resistance (3) and a control circuit (1) for controlling current flow through the ignition resistance (3). A region (Zb) of a semiconductor layer (Ps) provided to electrically interconnect integrated components is used as ignition resistance (1). In this region (Zb), a recess (As) is provided in the electroconducting layer (Alu1) which establishes an electric contact with the control circuit (1) or in a semiconductor layer for the components.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 3/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/13 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/13 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9932846A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9932846 A1 19990701; DE 19756563 C1 19990819; EP 1040311 A1 20001004; EP 1040311 B1 20020320; JP 2001527204 A 20011225; US 6302024 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051215

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-12-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2005-02-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041207

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803470 20020425

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010802

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT