Global patent index - EP 1040327 A1

EP 1040327 A1 2000-10-04 - PORTABLE SCALE

Title (en)

PORTABLE SCALE

Title (de)

TRAGBARE WAAGE

Title (fr)

BALANCE PORTATIVE

Publication

EP 1040327 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966217 A

Priority

  • DE 9803705 W
  • DE 29722105 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2312868A1] The invention relates to a scale (20) having two force meter devices (21, 22) which independently of each other can be subjected to a weight and a display device (32) for indicating the sum of the weights. The force meter devices (21, 22) are connected to each other in such a way that the one force meter device (21) can rotate in relation to the other force meter device (22). This design allows for the force meter devices (21, 22) to be folded up and thus makes the scale easy to transport. The invention provides for three sensors (34, 35, 36) at the level of the force meter devices (21, 22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01G 21/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01G 21/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01G 21/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931470A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29722105 U1 19980219; AU 2264299 A 19990705; BR 9814267 A 20001003; CA 2312868 A1 19990624; CN 1282418 A 20010131; DE 19881928 D2 20000316; EP 1040327 A1 20001004; JP 2002508508 A 20020319; WO 9931470 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status

2007-07-27 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1031420

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2002-10-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020423

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011203

2002-01-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PORTABLE AND FOLDABLE SCALE WITH VERTICAL AXIS OF ROTATION

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT