Global Patent Index - EP 1040365 A1

EP 1040365 A1 2000-10-04 - ULTRASOUND SENSOR

Title (en)

ULTRASOUND SENSOR

Title (de)

ULTRASCHALLSENSOR

Title (fr)

DETECTEUR A ULTRASONS

Publication

EP 1040365 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965114 A

Priority

  • DE 9803655 W
  • DE 19755729 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19755729A1] The invention relates to an ultrasound sensor, consisting of a housing with a plug-in connection, an ultrasonic transducer and a printed circuit board. According to the invention, the housing is divided into a support and a hood which surrounds said support. The support supports the printed circuit board, the plug-in connection and the ultrasonic transducer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 7/521; G10K 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 3/00 (2006.01); G10K 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 9/122 (2013.01); G10K 9/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931526A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19755729 A1 19990617; EP 1040365 A1 20001004; EP 1040365 B1 20030709; US 6532193 B1 20030311; WO 9931526 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141214

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141214

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20141214

2014-06-05 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59809001

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140424

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59809001

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020502

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT