Global Patent Index - EP 1040398 A2

EP 1040398 A2 2000-10-04 - DIGITALLY CONTROLLED ILLUMINATION METHODS AND SYSTEMS

Title (en)

DIGITALLY CONTROLLED ILLUMINATION METHODS AND SYSTEMS

Title (de)

DIGITAL GESTEUERTE BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEME UND -VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES D'ECLAIRAGE A COMMANDE NUMERIQUE

Publication

EP 1040398 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98964035 A

Priority

  • US 9826853 W
  • US 7128197 P
  • US 6879297 P
  • US 7886198 P
  • US 7928598 P
  • US 9092098 P
  • US 9817702 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9931560A2] Provided herein are methods and systems for illumination. The methods and systems may include LED systems associated with a processor. Various environments and applications of processor-controlled LED systems are provided, including kinetic illumination, precision illumination, a smart light bulb, a lighting entertainment system, a power/data protocol, a data delivery track, lighting components and sensor/feedback applications.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/02 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); G05D 1/00 (2006.01); G05F 1/00 (2006.01); G08B 23/00 (2006.01); G09G 3/32 (2006.01); H01L 33/12 (2010.01); H01L 33/58 (2010.01); H05B 39/04 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

G05D (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/0818 (2013.01); H05B 33/0803 (2013.01); H05B 33/0857 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9931560 A2 19990624; WO 9931560 A3 19990902; WO 9931560 A8 19991007; AU 1924199 A 19990705; EP 1040398 A2 20001004; EP 1040398 B1 20180221; ES 2666995 T3 20180509

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 972405 T

- Effective date: 20180221

2018-06-27 [REG NL MP] PATENT VOIDED (INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED)

- Effective date: 20180221

2018-05-09 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2666995 T3

- Effective date: 20180509

2018-03-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2018-03-15 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69843662

2018-03-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 972405 T

- Effective date: 20180315

2018-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2018-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2018-02-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2017-07-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170622

2017-05-31 [INTC] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT (DELETED)

2017-01-18 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20161223

2017-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BLACKWELL, MICHAEL, K.

2017-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LYS, IHOR, A.

2017-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MORGAN, FREDERICK, MARSHALL

2017-01-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUELLER, GEORGE, G.

2015-10-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS LIGHTING NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION

2008-10-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PHILIPS SOLID-STATE LIGHTING SOLUTIONS, INC.

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040312

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MUELLER, GEORGE, G.

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LYS, IHOR, A.

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: MORGAN, FREDERICK, MARSHALL

2001-01-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BLACKWELL, MICHAEL, K.

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000711

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE