Global Patent Index - EP 1040454 A1

EP 1040454 A1 2000-10-04 - METHOD FOR REALLOCATING AN ACTUATING ELEMENT TO A REMOTE CONTROL DEVICE, AND REMOTE CONTROL DEVICE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REALLOCATING AN ACTUATING ELEMENT TO A REMOTE CONTROL DEVICE, AND REMOTE CONTROL DEVICE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM NEUZUORDNEN EINES BETÄTIGUNGSELEMENTS ZU EINER FERNWIRKEINRICHTUNG UND FERNWIRKEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR REATTRIBUER UN ELEMENT DE COMMANDE A UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE A DISTANCE, ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE A DISTANCE Y RELATIF

Publication

EP 1040454 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98963383 A

Priority

  • DE 9803475 W
  • DE 19757037 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19757037A1] A base station detects whether a pre-assigned operating unit (such as a transponder) exists in the range of a transmission path. The base station detects an operating unit to be reassigned. Assignment information is transferred from the pre-assigned operating unit to the operating unit to be reassigned. The assigned operating unit is blocked against a retransmission of the assignment information. A remote operating system is also claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 49/00 (2006.01); B60R 25/04 (2006.01); G06K 17/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01); H04B 1/59 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07C 9/00111 (2013.01); G07C 9/00015 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933028A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19757037 A1 19990624; EP 1040454 A1 20001004; EP 1040454 B1 20020522; JP 2001527250 A 20011225; WO 9933028 A1 19990701; WO 9933028 A8 20010201

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-05-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030225

2002-11-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-11-20 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-10-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020822

2002-06-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59804211 20020627

2002-05-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-05-22 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020522

2000-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000720

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE