Global Patent Index - EP 1040459 A1

EP 1040459 A1 2000-10-04 - ACOUSTIC EMISSION SEVERANCE DETECTOR AND METHOD

Title (en)

ACOUSTIC EMISSION SEVERANCE DETECTOR AND METHOD

Title (de)

BRÜCHENDETEKTOR AUS AKUSTISEHER AUSGABE UND VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

DETECTEUR DE RUPTURES A EMISSION ACOUSTIQUE ET PROCEDE CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 1040459 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964072 A

Priority

  • US 9826928 W
  • US 99523797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5905440A] The invention has utility generally for monitoring any part for severance of the part. The invention is specifically useful for monitoring severance of a tension blade in a tension blade grid. For general monitoring of a part, the apparatus has wireless connection between the sensing unit and the control unit. The wireless connection is achieved with a transmit/receive unit using radiofrequency power transfer for electrical power and using infrared transmitters and receivers for signal transfer. For food processing, specifically for a vegetable cutting method employing at least one tension blade in a first tension blade grid through which vegetables are passed for cutting the vegetables wherein the at least one tension blade is severed during the cutting, the invention provides for diverting the vegetables to a second tension blade grid. Diversion is accomplished with an acoustic emission sensor acoustically coupled to the at least one tension blade so that during the vegetable cutting, the acoustic emission sensor detects acoustic energy from tension blade severance. The acoustic energy is converted to an electronic signal that is compared in a microprocessor to a threshold. In a severance condition, an actuator receives an alarm signal from the microprocessor and diverts the vegetables to the second tension blade grid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 21/00; B26D 1/553; B26D 3/18; B26D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 5/00 (2006.01); G05B 19/4065 (2006.01); B26D 1/553 (2006.01); B26D 3/18 (2006.01); B26D 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G05B 19/4065 (2013.01); B26D 5/00 (2013.01); B26D 1/553 (2013.01); B26D 3/185 (2013.01); B26D 3/26 (2013.01); G05B 2219/37245 (2013.01); G05B 2219/37337 (2013.01); G05B 2219/37351 (2013.01); G05B 2219/37433 (2013.01); G05B 2219/37434 (2013.01); G05B 2219/50203 (2013.01); Y10T 83/0443 (2015.04); Y10T 83/089 (2015.04); Y10T 83/141 (2015.04); Y10T 83/148 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 5905440 A 19990518; AT 377818 T 20071115; AU 1927099 A 19990712; AU 752974 B2 20021003; CA 2310688 A1 19990701; CA 2310688 C 20080429; DE 69838682 D1 20071220; DE 69838682 T2 20080828; EP 1040459 A1 20001004; EP 1040459 A4 20051109; EP 1040459 B1 20071107; EP 1040459 B8 20080102; NO 20003032 A 20000725; NO 20003032 D0 20000614; NO 320634 B1 20060102; NZ 504513 A 20020927; PL 192345 B1 20061031; PL 341304 A1 20010409; TR 200001716 T2 20001121; WO 9933038 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141218

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141218

2015-07-29 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69838682

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2014-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131210

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-10-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071218

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080822

2008-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080808

2008-08-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071107

2008-05-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071107

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080218

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071107

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080207

2008-02-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: CONAGRA FOODS LAMB WESTON, INC. EN BATTELLE MEMORI

- Effective date: 20071205

2007-12-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69838682 P 20071220

2007-12-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CONAGRA FOODS LAMB WESTON, INC.

2007-12-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE

2007-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2007-11-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE LI NL SE

2007-11-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-11-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050922

2005-11-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 08B 21/00 A

2005-11-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26D 3/18 B

2005-11-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26D 1/553 B

2005-11-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 26D 5/00 B

2005-10-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JULIAN, JOHN

2005-10-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SKORPIK, JAMES, R.

2005-10-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARRIS, JOE, C.

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000511

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE LI NL SE