Global Patent Index - EP 1040481 A1

EP 1040481 A1 2000-10-04 - METHOD FOR REPRODUCING A RECORDING SIGNAL WITH POSITIONING MEANS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REPRODUCING A RECORDING SIGNAL WITH POSITIONING MEANS

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM WIEDERGEBEN EINES AUFZEICHNUNGSSIGNALES MIT POSITIONIERUNGSMITTELN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE REPRODUCTION D'UN SIGNAL D'ENREGISTREMENT DOTE DE MOYENS DE POSITIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1040481 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99939429 A

Priority

  • EP 99939429 A
  • EP 9905521 W
  • EP 98890224 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0008647A1] The invention relates to a device (1) having reproduction means (6) for reproducing a recording signal (AS) recorded on a recording support (5) from a starting position (P1) of the recording support (5) and a recording starting time (T1). It also comprises at least one playback head (7, 8) and positioning means (27) to position the at least one playback head (7, 8) in a desired recording support position (GP1, GP2). Input means (30) are provided to input reproduction time information (WZI) characterizing a desired reproduction time (GT1, GT2), wherein the desired reproduction time (GT1, GT2) corresponds to the sum of starting time information (BZI) characterizing the recording starting time (T1) and the already elapsed recording duration (VD1, VD2) for recording the recording signal (AS) in the desired position (GT1, GT2) of the recording support (5). The positioning means (27) subtract the starting time information (BZI) from the inputted reproduction time information (WZI) when determining the desired recording support position (GP1, GP2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 27/10; G11B 15/02; G11B 27/30; G11B 27/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/78 (2006.01); G11B 15/02 (2006.01); G11B 15/087 (2006.01); G11B 15/14 (2006.01); G11B 15/18 (2006.01); G11B 20/10 (2006.01); G11B 27/10 (2006.01); G11B 27/11 (2006.01); G11B 27/13 (2006.01); G11B 27/30 (2006.01); G11B 27/32 (2006.01); G11B 27/34 (2006.01); H04N 5/7826 (2006.01); H04N 5/92 (2006.01); H04N 9/79 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/9201 (2013.01); G11B 15/026 (2013.01); G11B 15/087 (2013.01); G11B 15/14 (2013.01); G11B 15/1816 (2013.01); G11B 27/107 (2013.01); G11B 27/11 (2013.01); G11B 27/13 (2013.01); G11B 27/3063 (2013.01); G11B 27/324 (2013.01); G11B 27/328 (2013.01); G11B 27/34 (2013.01); G11B 15/023 (2013.01); G11B 15/1875 (2013.01); G11B 27/105 (2013.01); G11B 2220/216 (2013.01); G11B 2220/2562 (2013.01); G11B 2220/90 (2013.01); G11B 2220/91 (2013.01); H04N 9/7921 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0008647A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0008647 A1 20000217; EP 1040481 A1 20001004; JP 2002522863 A 20020723

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050127

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030710

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000817

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE