Global Patent Index - EP 1040491 A1

EP 1040491 A1 2000-10-04 - POWER TRANSFORMER FOR A SWITCHED MODE POWER SUPPLY, ESPECIALLY FOR STUD WELDING DEVICES

Title (en)

POWER TRANSFORMER FOR A SWITCHED MODE POWER SUPPLY, ESPECIALLY FOR STUD WELDING DEVICES

Title (de)

LEISTUNGSÜBERTRAGER FÜR EIN LEISTUNGSSCHALTNETZTEIL, INSBESONDERE FÜR BOLZENSCHWEISSGERÄTE

Title (fr)

TRANSFORMATEUR D'ALIMENTATION POUR ALIMENTATION A DECOUPAGE, NOTAMMENT POUR APPAREILS DE SOUDAGE A L'ARC AVEC PERCUSSION

Publication

EP 1040491 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966206 A

Priority

  • DE 9803623 W
  • DE 19756188 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19756188A1] The invention relates to a power transformer for a switched mode power supply, especially for a stud welding device, comprising a core which is closed in a ring shape and a primary and secondary winding which are arranged on said core. The primary winding consists of at least one primary stack (7) and the secondary winding consists of at least one secondary stack (9). The primary stacks (7) have at least one primary segment and the secondary stacks have at least one secondary segment, said segments being configured as spiral-shaped electrical conductors in one plane. The primary and secondary stacks (7, 9) are arranged in alternate, parallel layers on top of each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/2804 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9931681A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756188 A1 19990624; EP 1040491 A1 20001004; JP 2002509349 A 20020326; JP 4886110 B2 20120229; US 6339320 B1 20020115; WO 9931681 A1 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040405

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010925

2001-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NELSON BOLZENSCHWEISS-TECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

2000-11-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2000-11-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000609;SI PAYMENT 20000609

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000609;SI PAYMENT 20000609