Global Patent Index - EP 1040519 A1

EP 1040519 A1 2000-10-04 - PLASTIC COMPOSITE BODY

Title (en)

PLASTIC COMPOSITE BODY

Title (de)

KUNSTSTOFFVERBUNDKÖRPER

Title (fr)

CORPS COMPOSITE EN MATIERE PLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 1040519 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965611 A

Priority

  • DE 9803661 W
  • DE 19756887 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19756887A1] An integrated circuit has a lead frame to which a chip made of a semiconductor material is secured by an adhesive layer. The adhesive layer contains at least one filler and one plastic material. The filler comprises nanoscale, in particular spherical particles produced by a condensation process and which can be conductive or insulating. It is also possible to provide the chip with a plastic sheath that contains such fillers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 23/29; H01L 23/495

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 101/00 (2006.01); C08J 5/12 (2006.01); C08K 3/00 (2006.01); H01L 21/52 (2006.01); H01L 23/29 (2006.01); H01L 23/31 (2006.01); H01L 23/495 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 23/295 (2013.01); C08J 5/124 (2013.01); C08K 3/0008 (2013.01); H01L 23/49513 (2013.01); H01L 2924/0002 (2013.01); Y10S 977/779 (2013.01); Y10S 977/893 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31678 (2015.04)

Combination set (CPC)

H01L 2924/0002 + H01L 2924/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933106A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19756887 A1 19990701; EP 1040519 A1 20001004; JP 2001527131 A 20011225; US 6469086 B1 20021022; WO 9933106 A1 19990701

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-04 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20111007

2011-10-07 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R003

2010-06-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20051020

2001-08-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT