Global Patent Index - EP 1040546 A1

EP 1040546 A1 2000-10-04 - BATTERY MONITORING SYSTEM

Title (en)

BATTERY MONITORING SYSTEM

Title (de)

BATTERIEÜBERWACHUNGSEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE CONTROLE DE BATTERIES

Publication

EP 1040546 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98961698 A

Priority

  • NZ 9800168 W
  • NZ 32921697 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9927628A1] An electronically controlled system for monitoring a battery bank, which has associated with each battery or small group of batteries or cells a measurement module which among other things measures the cell voltage and cell temperature, digitally encodes and serially transmits these values via an isolated bus to a central processing unit (CPU) which stores and analyses the values and provides an indication of the status of each battery and produces alarms when appropriate. Each measuring module will be kept in close physical proximity to the batteries it measures such that the temperature measurement requires no extra outboard circuitry and electrical isolation between the monitoring system and the battery voltage is provided as close to each battery cell as possible. A number of measurement modules may be connected to common buses and each central processing unit may receive inputs from more than one bus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H02H 7/18; H02H 1/06; H02H 7/22; H02J 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01R 31/36 (2006.01); H02J 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01R 19/16542 (2013.01); G01R 31/3651 (2013.01); G01R 31/3658 (2013.01); G01R 31/3675 (2013.01); H02J 7/0021 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9927628 A1 19990603; AU 1696199 A 19990615; AU 724902 B2 20001005; EP 1040546 A1 20001004; EP 1040546 A4 20001122

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020601

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010305

2001-01-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HECTORS, ANTONIUS, CORNELIS

2001-01-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GUY, JONATHAN, ANDREW

2000-11-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 02H 7/18 A, 7H 02H 7/22 B, 7H 02H 1/06 B, 7H 02J 7/00 B, 7G 01R 31/36 B

2000-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000606

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE